This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 08:28:06 (UTC).

CMC STEEL FABRICATORS INC vs STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 CMC STEEL FABRICATORS INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STARR INDEMNITY LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald L. Styn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald L. Styn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMC STEEL FABRICATORS INC

Defendant

STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hirst, Paul C

Attorney at MCLEOD LAW GROUP APC

Defendant Attorney

Lotfi, Diana R

Attorney at FORAN GLENNON PALANDECH PONZI & RUDOLFF PC

 

Court Documents

Defendant Starr Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by CMC STEEL FABRICATORS INC. Refers to: STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by CMC STEEL FABRICATORS INC. Refers to: STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY

Complaint

Complaint filed by CMC STEEL FABRICATORS INC. Refers to: STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CMC STEEL FABRICATORS INC. Refers to: STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by CMC STEEL FABRICATORS INC. Refers to: STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY. Filed By: STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by CMC STEEL FABRICATORS INC. Refers to: STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY Filed By: CMC STEEL FABRICATORS INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by CMC STEEL FABRICATORS INC. Refers to: STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY Filed By: CMC STEEL FABRICATORS INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/16/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by CMC STEEL FABRICATORS INC. Refers to: STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY Filed By: CMC STEEL FABRICATORS INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by CMC STEEL FABRICATORS INC. Refers to: STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY Filed By: CMC STEEL FABRICATORS INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by CMC STEEL FABRICATORS INC. Refers to: STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY Filed By: CMC STEEL FABRICATORS INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CMC STEEL FABRICATORS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Starr Indemnity & Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hirst, Paul C