This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/09/2023 at 04:09:02 (UTC).

CLUB DEMONSTRATION SERVICES INC vs DAVIES

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 CLUB DEMONSTRATION SERVICES INC filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against DAVIES. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Club Demonstration Services Inc

Defendant

DAVIES, GARETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEGEWALD, HEIDI ELIZABETH

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSONPC

501 W Broadway #900

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Whooper, Jason A

1916 Third Ave

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (DEFENDANT/APPELLANT CLUB DEMONSTRATION SERVICES INC NOTICE OF POSTING BOND) filed by Club Demonstration Services Inc.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Club Demonstration Services Inc.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Club Demonstration Services Inc. Refers to: DAVIES, GARETH

Notice of Appeal of Labor Commissioner Award

Notice of Appeal of Labor Commissioner Award filed by Club Demonstration Services Inc. Refers to: DAVIES, GARETH

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Campagna,Anthony to C-61 effective 01/28/2022.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (OF CLAIMS AT DE NOVO TRIAL OF WAGE CLAIM) filed by DAVIES, GARETH.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by DAVIES, GARETH.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by DAVIES, GARETH.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Club Demonstration Services Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Club Demonstration Services Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Club Demonstration Services Inc.; Filed By: Club Demonstration Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Club Demonstration Services Inc.; Filed By: Club Demonstration Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appeal of Labor Commissioner Award dismissed with prejudice as to Club Demonstration Services Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appeal of Labor Commissioner Award dismissed with prejudice as to DAVIES, GARETH .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by DAVIES, GARETH.; Filed By: DAVIES, GARETH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by DAVIES, GARETH.; Filed By: DAVIES, GARETH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (OF CLAIMS AT DE NOVO TRIAL OF WAGE CLAIM) filed by DAVIES, GARETH.; Filed By: DAVIES, GARETH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Campagna,Anthony to C-61 effective 01/28/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (DEFENDANT/APPELLANT CLUB DEMONSTRATION SERVICES INC NOTICE OF POSTING BOND) filed by Club Demonstration Services Inc.; Filed By: Club Demonstration Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Club Demonstration Services Inc.; Filed By: Club Demonstration Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Campagna, Anthony.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Club Demonstration Services Inc. Refers to: DAVIES, GARETH; Filed By: Club Demonstration Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appeal of Labor Commissioner Award filed by Club Demonstration Services Inc. Refers to: DAVIES, GARETH; Filed By: Club Demonstration Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Club Demonstration Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Whooper, Jason A