This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/10/2019 at 07:13:36 (UTC).

Clifford Kaiser vs. MSK Management Inc

Case Summary

On 08/31/2010 Clifford Kaiser filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MSK Management Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAISER, CLIFFORD ; DBA : KAISER & ASSOCIATES IT CONSULTING

Defendant

MSK MANAGEMENT INC; DBA : MSK DEVELOPMENT GROUP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 12/10/2010 10:15:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 10/26/2010 10:15:00 AM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2010
  • Notice - Other (NOE returned 12/17/10 not deliverable as addressed) filed by MSK Management Inc. Refers to: MSK Management Inc Filed By: MSK Management Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 12/10/2010 10:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2010
  • The Court finds judgment on the Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court for Clifford Kaiser, DBA Kaiser & Associates IT Consulting and against MSK Management Inc, DBA MSK Development Group in the amount of: $5653.44 principal, $140.00 costs, $0 pre-judgment interest. By default.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal filed by Kaiser, Clifford. Refers to: MSK Management Inc Filed By: Kaiser, Clifford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 10/26/2010 10:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • Small Claims Court Trial reset to 12/10/2010 at 10:15AM in N-11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 10/26/2010 at 10:15:00 AM at North County in N-08 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • The Small Claims Court Trial was rescheduled to 10/26/2010 at 10:15:00 AM in N-08 before at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 10/12/2010 at 10:15:00 AM at North County in N-08 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • Case assigned to Department N-08.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Kaiser, Clifford.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSK MANAGEMENT INC; DBA : MSK DEVELOPMENT GROUP is a litigant