This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/12/2020 at 06:38:11 (UTC).

Clifford Horne vs. Zooks Earl Scheb Inc

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Clifford Horne filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Zooks Earl Scheb Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Horne, Clifford

Defendant

Zooks Earl Scheb Inc

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 04/14/2020 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-63 was vacated.

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute filed by Horne, Clifford. Refers to: Zooks Earl Scheb Inc

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Horne, Clifford. Refers to: Zooks Earl Scheb Inc

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Horne, Clifford.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 04/14/2020 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-63 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute filed by Horne, Clifford. Refers to: Zooks Earl Scheb Inc Filed By: Horne, Clifford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Horne, Clifford. Refers to: Zooks Earl Scheb Inc Filed By: Horne, Clifford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Horne, Clifford. Filed By: Horne, Clifford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 04/14/2020 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-63 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Horne, Clifford. Filed By: Horne, Clifford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less