This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/24/2022 at 01:34:53 (UTC).

Cliche vs The Regents of the University of California

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 Cliche filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against The Regents of the University of California. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew C. Braner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Matthew C. Braner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cliche, Joleen

Joleen Cliche as successor in interest to the Estate of Steven Cliche

Defendant

The Regents of the University of California

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Cliche, Joleen; Joleen Cliche as successor in interest to the Estate of Steven Cliche. Refers to: The Regents of the University of California

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cliche, Joleen. Refers to: The Regents of the University of California

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

ADR Packet generated.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Cliche, Joleen; Joleen Cliche as successor in interest to the Estate of Steven Cliche.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by Cliche, Joleen.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-60; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Cliche, Joleen.; Filed By: Cliche, Joleen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Cliche, Joleen; Joleen Cliche as successor in interest to the Estate of Steven Cliche.; Filed By: Cliche, Joleen (Plaintiff); Joleen Cliche as successor in interest to the Estate of Steven Cliche (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Packet generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Braner, Matthew.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cliche, Joleen. Refers to: The Regents of the University of California; Filed By: Cliche, Joleen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Cliche, Joleen; Joleen Cliche as successor in interest to the Estate of Steven Cliche. Refers to: The Regents of the University of California; Filed By: Cliche, Joleen (Plaintiff); Joleen Cliche as successor in interest to the Estate of Steven Cliche (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant