This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/08/2022 at 01:40:23 (UTC).

Clemente vs General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 Clemente filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clemente, Arnold

Defendant

General Motors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacobson, Kevin Y

Attorney at QUILL & ARROW LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Clemente, Arnold. Refers to: General Motors LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Clemente, Arnold. Refers to: General Motors LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Clemente, Arnold. Refers to: General Motors LLC

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Clemente, Arnold. Refers to: General Motors LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Clemente, Arnold. Refers to: General Motors LLC; Filed By: Clemente, Arnold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/14/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Clemente, Arnold. Refers to: General Motors LLC; Filed By: Clemente, Arnold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Clemente, Arnold. Refers to: General Motors LLC; Filed By: Clemente, Arnold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Clemente, Arnold. Refers to: General Motors LLC; Filed By: Clemente, Arnold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBSON KEVIN