This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/18/2020 at 02:05:33 (UTC).

Clay Jr vs Torres

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Clay Jr filed an Other lawsuit against Torres. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Clay Jr, Andrew

Respondent

Torres, Marissa

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • Restraining order as requested denied WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Temporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Minutes finalized for Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse heard 01/24/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Response to Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders filed by Torres, Marissa. Refers to: Clay, Andrew Filed By: Torres, Marissa (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Clay, Andrew Jr. Refers to: Torres, Marissa Filed By: Clay, Andrew Jr (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders (Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Prevention) filed by Clay, Andrew Jr. Refers to: Torres, Marissa Filed By: Clay, Andrew Jr (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Clay, Andrew Jr. Refers to: Torres, Marissa Filed By: Clay, Andrew Jr (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Case assigned to Department N-03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Temporary Restraining Order (Partly GRANTED and partly DENIED; PERSONAL CONDUCT ORDERS ONLY) filed by Clay, Andrew Jr. Refers to: Torres, Marissa Filed By: Clay, Andrew Jr (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Notice of Court Hearing filed by Clay, Andrew Jr. Refers to: Torres, Marissa Filed By: Clay, Andrew Jr (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse scheduled for 01/24/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-03 .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.