This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 11:37:06 (UTC).

CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP vs MIX BEVERAGE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING BEV GROUP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MIX BEVERAGE CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP

Defendant

MIX BEVERAGE CORPORATION; DBA : Coast Beverage Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chow, Ron

Attorney at GARDENER RIECHMANN & CHOW

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP. Refers to: MIX BEVERAGE CORPORATION

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP. Refers to: MIX BEVERAGE CORPORATION

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP. Refers to: MIX BEVERAGE CORPORATION

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/13/2021 01:30:00 PM.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP. Refers to: MIX BEVERAGE CORPORATION

Request for Entry of Default (Requests)

Request for Entry of Default (Not Entered) filed by CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP. Refers to: MIX BEVERAGE CORPORATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Status Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) scheduled for 04/29/2022 at 02:30PM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/13/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP. Filed By: CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (Not Entered) filed by CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP. Refers to: MIX BEVERAGE CORPORATION Filed By: CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP. Refers to: MIX BEVERAGE CORPORATION Filed By: CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketThe default filed by CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP was entered as to MIX BEVERAGE CORPORATION on Complaint . Override feature used.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP. Refers to: MIX BEVERAGE CORPORATION Filed By: CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP. Refers to: MIX BEVERAGE CORPORATION Filed By: CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP. Refers to: MIX BEVERAGE CORPORATION Filed By: CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEV GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Mix Beverage Corporation a CA Corp; DBA : Coast Beverage is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOW RON