This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 02:44:02 (UTC).

CK Ventures LLC VS Love

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 CK Ventures LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Love. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CK Ventures LLC

Defendant

Love, Jordon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Baillio, Brett Austin

Attorney at MAXWELL & MORGAN PC

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service By First-Class Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by CK Ventures LLC.

Notice of Motion and Motion of TCK Ventures, LLC for Attorneys' Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Motion for Attorney Fees filed by CK Ventures LLC.

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion of CK Ventures, LLC for Attorneys' Fees and Costs

Request for Judicial Notice (in support of motion for attorney fees) filed by CK Ventures LLC.

[Proposed] Order Granting Motion of CK Ventures, LLC for Attorneys' Fees and Costs

Proposed Order (in support of motion for attorney fees) submitted by CK Ventures LLC received but not filed on 05/13/2021.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 07/01/2021 01:30:00 PM.

Order - Other

Order - Other (Order granting motion of CK Ventures, LLC for attorneys' fees and costs) filed by CK Ventures LLC.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Abstract of Judgment (Received on 08/13/2021) submitted by CK Ventures LLC rejected on 08/16/2021.

Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution submitted by CK Ventures LLC received but not filed on 10/18/2021.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by CK Ventures LLC.

Application for Order and Publication of Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment; Points and Authorities; Declaration

Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by CK Ventures LLC.

Order After Ex Parte Application for Publication of Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment

Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by CK Ventures LLC.

Proof of Service of Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment

Proof of Service filed by CK Ventures LLC.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by CK Ventures LLC.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by CK Ventures LLC.

Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution submitted by CK Ventures LLC received but not filed on 12/28/2020.

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by CK Ventures LLC.

Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment

Sister-State Judgment - Application for Entry filed by CK Ventures LLC. Refers to: Love, Jordon

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CK Ventures LLC. Refers to: Love, Jordon

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution submitted by CK Ventures LLC received but not filed on 10/18/2021. Filed By: CK Ventures LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by CK Ventures LLC. Filed By: CK Ventures LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment submitted by CK Ventures LLC received but not filed on 08/26/2021. Filed By: CK Ventures LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment (Received on 08/13/2021) submitted by CK Ventures LLC rejected on 08/16/2021. Filed By: CK Ventures LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 07/01/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Order granting motion of CK Ventures, LLC for attorneys' fees and costs) filed by CK Ventures LLC. Filed By: CK Ventures LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by CK Ventures LLC. Filed By: CK Ventures LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Attorney Fees filed by CK Ventures LLC. Filed By: CK Ventures LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice (in support of motion for attorney fees) filed by CK Ventures LLC. Filed By: CK Ventures LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by CK Ventures LLC. Filed By: CK Ventures LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by CK Ventures LLC. Filed By: CK Ventures LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSister-State Judgment - Notice of Entry filed by CK Ventures LLC. Refers to: Love, Jordon Filed By: CK Ventures LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSister-State Judgment - Application for Entry filed by CK Ventures LLC. Refers to: Love, Jordon Filed By: CK Ventures LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by CK Ventures LLC. Refers to: Love, Jordon Filed By: CK Ventures LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSister-State Judgment filed by CK Ventures LLC. Refers to: Love, Jordon Filed By: CK Ventures LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for CK Ventures LLC and against Love, Jordon for $ 3370.52, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 977.63, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 4348.15.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAILLIO, BRETT AUSTIN