This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/12/2023 at 06:22:34 (UTC).

City of San Diego vs Xtracta Distribution Inc

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 City of San Diego filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Xtracta Distribution Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew C. Braner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Matthew C. Braner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of San Diego

Defendants

Dang, Steven Michael

Rolfsen, chase Andrew

Xtracta Distribution Inc; FKA : Xtracta Distribution LLC

Xtracta Distribution LLC; DBA : Flav

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sullivan, Mikki

Defendant Attorney

Rozmus, Tamara Leetham

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/02/2022 11:00:00 AM.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Dang, Steven Michael; Xtracta Distribution Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Dang, Steven Michael; Xtracta Distribution Inc.

City of San Diego's Proof of Service re Case Management Statement

Proof of Service filed by City of San Diego.

City of San Diego's Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by City of San Diego.

Stipulation and Order to Strike Request for Attorney Fees in Defendants' Answer in the Prayer for Relief

Stipulation - Other (and Order to Strike Request for Attorney Fees in Defendants Answer in the Prayer Relief) filed by City of San Diego; Xtracta Distribution Inc.

Answer

Answer filed by Xtracta Distribution Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Dang, Steven Michael.

Answer

Answer filed by Dang, Steven Michael.

Proof of Service of Summons (Defendant Xtracta Distribution LLC)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by City of San Diego. Refers to: Xtracta Distribution LLC

Proof of Service of Summons (Defendant Xtracta Distribution Inc.)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by City of San Diego. Refers to: Xtracta Distribution Inc

Proof of Service of Summons (Defendant Dang individually)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by City of San Diego. Refers to: Dang, Steven

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by City of San Diego. Refers to: Xtracta Distribution Inc; Xtracta Distribution LLC; Dang, Steven; Rolfsen, chase

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by City of San Diego. Refers to: Xtracta Distribution Inc; Xtracta Distribution LLC; Dang, Steven; Rolfsen, chase

Complaint

Complaint filed by City of San Diego. Refers to: Xtracta Distribution Inc; Xtracta Distribution LLC; Dang, Steven; Rolfsen, chase

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-60; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/02/2022 11:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to Court's motion to 03/03/2023 at 10:00AM before Judge Matthew C. Braner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Dang, Steven Michael; Xtracta Distribution Inc.; Filed By: Dang, Steven Michael (Defendant); Xtracta Distribution Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Dang, Steven Michael; Xtracta Distribution Inc.; Filed By: Dang, Steven Michael (Defendant); Xtracta Distribution Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by City of San Diego.; Filed By: City of San Diego (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by City of San Diego.; Filed By: City of San Diego (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other (and Order to Strike Request for Attorney Fees in Defendants Answer in the Prayer Relief) filed by City of San Diego; Xtracta Distribution Inc.; Filed By: City of San Diego (Plaintiff); Xtracta Distribution Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Xtracta Distribution Inc.; Filed By: Xtracta Distribution Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Dang, Steven Michael.; Filed By: Dang, Steven Michael (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by City of San Diego. Refers to: Xtracta Distribution LLC; Filed By: City of San Diego (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by City of San Diego. Refers to: Xtracta Distribution Inc; Filed By: City of San Diego (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by City of San Diego. Refers to: Dang, Steven; Filed By: City of San Diego (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/02/2022 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Braner, Matthew.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by City of San Diego. Refers to: Xtracta Distribution Inc; Xtracta Distribution LLC; Dang, Steven; Rolfsen, chase; Filed By: City of San Diego (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by City of San Diego. Refers to: Xtracta Distribution Inc; Xtracta Distribution LLC; Dang, Steven; Rolfsen, chase; Filed By: City of San Diego (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by City of San Diego. Refers to: Xtracta Distribution Inc; Xtracta Distribution LLC; Dang, Steven; Rolfsen, chase; Filed By: City of San Diego (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less