This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/07/2018 at 01:19:15 (UTC).

CITY OF EL CENTRO vs DAVID LANIER

Case Summary

On 02/20/2014 CITY OF EL CENTRO filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against DAVID LANIER. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL R. WOHLFEIL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL R. WOHLFEIL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

CITY OF CARLSBAD

CITY OF EL CAJON

CITY OF FRESNO

CITY OF OCEANSIDE

CITY OF VISTA

CITY OF EL CENTRO

Appellant and Petitioner

CITY OF EL CENTRO

Defendants and Respondents

CHRISTINE BAKER in her official capacity as the STATE OF CALIFORNIA DIRECTOR OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS

DAVID LANIER in his official capacity as the SECRETARY OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA LABOR & WORKFO

JULIE A SU in her official capacity as the STATE OF CALFORNIA LABOR COMMISSIONER

THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

DAVID LANIER IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS THE SECRETARY OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA LABOR & WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT AGENCY

STATE BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION TRADES COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA AFL-CIO

Respondent and Intervenor

STATE BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION TRADES COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA AFL-CIO

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Appellant and Petitioner Attorneys

Lough, James P

Attorney at LOUNSBERY FERGUSON ALTONA & PEAK LLP

960 Canterbury Place 300

Escondido, CA 92025

FELD, KAREN A

Attorney at COTA COLE LLP

3401 Centrelake Drive Suite 670

Ontario, CA 91761

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

NGUYEN, KIM L

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

300 S Spring Street 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

TRICE, LAURA S

177 Post Street 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

KRONLAND, SCOTT A

Attorney at ALTSCHULER BERZON LLP

177 Post St #300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Respondent and Intervenor Attorneys

TRICE, LAURA S

177 Post Street 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

KRONLAND, SCOTT A

Attorney at ALTSCHULER BERZON LLP

177 Post St #300

San Francisco, CA 94108

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by CITY OF CARLSBAD; CITY OF EL CAJON; CITY OF FRESNO; CITY OF OCEANSIDE; CITY OF VISTA; CITY OF EL CENTRO.

of James P Lough

Declaration - Other filed by CITY OF CARLSBAD; CITY OF EL CAJON; CITY OF FRESNO; CITY OF OCEANSIDE; CITY OF VISTA; CITY OF EL CENTRO.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by CITY OF EL CENTRO.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Notice of Ruling) filed by CITY OF EL CENTRO.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 130)

Objections

Objections filed by State Building and Construction Trades Council of California AFL-CIO.

Disbursement of Clerk's Trust Fund

Disbursement of Clerk's Trust Fund filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

of Benjamin C Lee in Support of Amicus Curiae Brief of California State Senate

Declaration - Other (of Benjamin C Lee in Support of Amicus Curiae Brief of California State Senate) filed by CALIFORNIA STATE SENATE.

Petition for Writ of Mandate

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed by CITY OF EL CENTRO. Refers to: CITY OF CARLSBAD; CITY OF EL CAJON; CITY OF FRESNO; CITY OF OCEANSIDE; CITY OF VISTA; DAVID LANIER in his official capacity as the SECRETARY OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA LABOR & WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT AGENCY; CHRISTINE BAKER in her official capacity as the STATE OF CALIFORNIA DIRECTOR OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS; JULIE A SU in her official capacity as the STATE OF CALFORNIA LABOR COMMISSIONER; THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (DEC OF ALENA SHAMOS IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS REPLY) filed by CITY OF CARLSBAD; CITY OF EL CAJON; CITY OF FRESNO; CITY OF OCEANSIDE; CITY OF VISTA; CITY OF EL CENTRO.

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

[Another document for ROA# 97]

Notice of Appeal

[Another document for ROA# 144]

Receipt for Record on Appeal

Receipt for Record on Appeal (Receipt filed by DCA & returned to Sup. Ct. for processing (D066755)) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by State Building and Construction Trades Council of California AFL-CIO.

Record on Appeal Civil Case Index Form -Alphabetical SD

Record on Appeal Civil Case Index Form -Alphabetical SD generated.

Judgment Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Compaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief

Judgment (Judgment Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Compaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief) filed by CITY OF CARLSBAD; CITY OF EL CAJON; CITY OF FRESNO; CITY OF OCEANSIDE; CITY OF VISTA; CITY OF EL CENTRO.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by CITY OF EL CENTRO; CITY OF CARLSBAD; CITY OF EL CAJON; CITY OF FRESNO; CITY OF OCEANSIDE; CITY OF VISTA.

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by CITY OF EL CENTRO. Filed By: CITY OF EL CENTRO (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs on Appeal filed by State Building and Construction Trades Council of California AFL-CIO. Filed By: State Building and Construction Trades Council of California AFL-CIO (Respondent On Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs on Appeal filed by State Building and Construction Trades Council of California AFL-CIO. Filed By: State Building and Construction Trades Council of California AFL-CIO (Respondent On Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for CHRISTINE BAKER in her official capacity as the STATE OF CALIFORNIA DIRECTOR OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS;DAVID LANIER in his official capacity as the SECRETARY OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA LABOR & WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT AGENCY;JULIE A SU in her official capacity as the STATE OF CALFORNIA LABOR COMMISSIONER;State Building and Construction Trades Council of California AFL-CIO;THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA and against CITY OF CARLSBAD;CITY OF EL CAJON;CITY OF EL CENTRO;CITY OF FRESNO;CITY OF OCEANSIDE;CITY OF VISTA for $ 0.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Notice of Appeal dismissed without prejudice as to CITY OF VISTA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Notice of Appeal dismissed without prejudice as to CITY OF OCEANSIDE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Notice of Appeal dismissed without prejudice as to CITY OF FRESNO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Notice of Appeal dismissed without prejudice as to CITY OF EL CENTRO.

    Read MoreRead Less
149 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2014
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 04/23/2014 at 08:15:00 AM at Central in C-71 Ronald S. Prager.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 10/10/2014 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-71 Ronald S. Prager.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Leave to Intervene filed by State Building and Construction Trades Council of California, AFL-CIO. Filed By: State Building and Construction Trades Council of California AFL-CIO (Interested Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 05/09/2014 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-71 Ronald S. Prager.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • Case reassigned from Appellate Division to Ronald Prager effective 02/21/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Case assigned to Department Appellate Division.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by CITY OF EL CENTRO. Filed By: CITY OF EL CENTRO (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CITY OF EL CENTRO. Filed By: CITY OF EL CENTRO (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Writ of Mandate filed by CITY OF EL CENTRO. Refers to: CITY OF CARLSBAD; CITY OF EL CAJON; CITY OF FRESNO; CITY OF OCEANSIDE; CITY OF VISTA; DAVID LANIER in his official capacity as the SECRETARY OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA LABOR & WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT AGENCY; CHRISTINE BAKER in her official capacity as the STATE OF CALIFORNIA DIRECTOR OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS; JULIE A SU in her official capacity as the STATE OF CALFORNIA LABOR COMMISSIONER; THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA Filed By: CITY OF EL CENTRO (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less