Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/14/2020 at 08:36:23 (UTC).

City Heights Ten LP VS Tyson

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 City Heights Ten LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Tyson. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City Heights Ten LP

Defendant

Tyson, Javanna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garcia, Eduardo

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by City Heights Ten LP. Refers to: Tyson, Javanna

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by City Heights Ten LP. Refers to: Tyson, Javanna

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by City Heights Ten LP. Refers to: Tyson, Javanna

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Application for Order Allowing Service of Summons by Posting and Mailing

Application for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing (ORDER SIGNED 1-29-2020) filed by City Heights Ten LP. Refers to: Tyson, Javanna

Declaration of Due Diligence

Declaration of Due Diligence filed by City Heights Ten LP. Refers to: Tyson, Javanna

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (Including Unknowns) filed by City Heights Ten LP. Refers to: Tyson, Javanna

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (Entered, Including Unknowns) filed by City Heights Ten LP. Refers to: Tyson, Javanna

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by City Heights Ten LP received but not filed on 02/20/2020.

Proof of service by Posting(UD)

Proof of service by Posting(UD) filed by City Heights Ten LP. Refers to: Tyson, Javanna

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by City Heights Ten LP.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (Including Unknowns) filed by City Heights Ten LP. Refers to: Tyson, Javanna Filed By: City Heights Ten LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketJudgment entered for City Heights Ten LP and against Tyson, Javanna for a grand total of $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (Entered, Including Unknowns) filed by City Heights Ten LP. Refers to: Tyson, Javanna Filed By: City Heights Ten LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by City Heights Ten LP received but not filed on 02/20/2020. Filed By: City Heights Ten LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service by Posting(UD) filed by City Heights Ten LP. Refers to: Tyson, Javanna Filed By: City Heights Ten LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by City Heights Ten LP. Filed By: City Heights Ten LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Tyson, Javanna on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by City Heights Ten LP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing (ORDER SIGNED 1-29-2020) filed by City Heights Ten LP. Refers to: Tyson, Javanna Filed By: City Heights Ten LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence filed by City Heights Ten LP. Refers to: Tyson, Javanna Filed By: City Heights Ten LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by City Heights Ten LP. Refers to: Tyson, Javanna Filed By: City Heights Ten LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by City Heights Ten LP. Refers to: Tyson, Javanna Filed By: City Heights Ten LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by City Heights Ten LP. Refers to: Tyson, Javanna Filed By: City Heights Ten LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less