This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 06:56:57 (UTC).

Citizens to Save Palomar Health vs Palomar Health District

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 Citizens to Save Palomar Health filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against Palomar Health District. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************M-NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Citizens to Save Palomar Health

Respondents

Palomar Health Board of Directors

Palomar Health District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kiamilev, Chandra

10755 Scripps Poway Pkwy 428

San Diego, CA 92131

 

Court Documents

Notice of Errata

Notice of Errata filed by Citizens to Save Palomar Health.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 4]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 4]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Citizens to Save Palomar Health. Refers to: Palomar Health District; Palomar Health Board of Directors

Petition for Writ of Mandate

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed by Citizens to Save Palomar Health. Refers to: Palomar Health District; Palomar Health Board of Directors

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Citizens to Save Palomar Health. Refers to: Palomar Health District; Palomar Health Board of Directors

Stipulation

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Citizens to Save Palomar Health; Palomar Health District; Palomar Health Board of Directors.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt re Palomar Health Board of Directors

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Citizens to Save Palomar Health. Refers to: Palomar Health Board of Directors

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt re Palmar Health Districtt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Citizens to Save Palomar Health. Refers to: Palomar Health District

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate dismissed without prejudice as to Citizens to Save Palomar Health.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate dismissed without prejudice as to Palomar Health District.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate dismissed without prejudice as to Palomar Health Board of Directors.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Citizens to Save Palomar Health. Refers to: Palomar Health District; Palomar Health Board of Directors Filed By: Citizens to Save Palomar Health (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Citizens to Save Palomar Health; Palomar Health District; Palomar Health Board of Directors. Filed By: Citizens to Save Palomar Health (Petitioner); Palomar Health District (Respondent); Palomar Health Board of Directors (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Citizens to Save Palomar Health. Refers to: Palomar Health District Filed By: Citizens to Save Palomar Health (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Citizens to Save Palomar Health. Refers to: Palomar Health Board of Directors Filed By: Citizens to Save Palomar Health (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate filed by Citizens to Save Palomar Health. Refers to: Palomar Health District; Palomar Health Board of Directors Filed By: Citizens to Save Palomar Health (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Citizens to Save Palomar Health. Refers to: Palomar Health District; Palomar Health Board of Directors Filed By: Citizens to Save Palomar Health (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Errata filed by Citizens to Save Palomar Health. Filed By: Citizens to Save Palomar Health (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Palomar Health District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kiamilev, Chandra