This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/26/2018 at 00:19:16 (UTC).

Citibank (South Dakota) N.A. vs. Casey Garcia

Case Summary

On 03/30/2009 Citibank South Dakota N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Casey Garcia. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) NA

Defendant

GARCIA, CASEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HENRIQUES, JANALIE

Attorney at HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Road 8

San Jose, CA 95119-1306

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/03/2009 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Motion - Other (TO COMPEL ARBITRATION) submitted by Garcia, Casey rejected on 07/02/2009.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/12/2009 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/17/2009 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/03/2009 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 04/27/2010 10:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 09/04/2009 08:35:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/12/2009 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/17/2009 08:30:00 AM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2010
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Citibank (South Dakota) N.A.. Refers to: Garcia, Casey Filed By: Citibank (South Dakota) NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 04/27/2010 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration of Plaintiff in Lieu of Personal Testimony at Trial (CCP 98)) filed by Citibank (South Dakota) N.A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • Notice of Hearing (TRIAL) filed by Citibank (South Dakota) N.A.. Filed By: Citibank (South Dakota) NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/17/2009 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • The Civil Court Trial is scheduled for 04/27/2010 at 10:00 AM before William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2009
  • Civil Court Trial scheduled for 04/27/2010 at 10:00:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/17/2009 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/03/2009 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Citibank (South Dakota) N.A.. Refers to: Garcia, Casey Filed By: Citibank (South Dakota) NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2009
  • Motion - Other (COMPEL ARBITRATION) filed by Garcia, Casey. Filed By: Garcia, Casey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/12/2009 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 09/04/2009 at 08:35:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion - Other (TO COMPEL ARBITRATION) submitted by Garcia, Casey rejected on 07/02/2009. Filed By: Garcia, Casey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • Answer filed by Garcia, Casey. Refers to: Citibank (South Dakota) NA Filed By: Garcia, Casey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2009
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2009
  • Original Summons filed by Citibank (South Dakota) N.A.. Refers to: Garcia, Casey Filed By: Citibank (South Dakota) NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Citibank (South Dakota) N.A.. Refers to: Garcia, Casey Filed By: Citibank (South Dakota) NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2009
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Citibank (South Dakota) N.A.. Refers to: Garcia, Casey Filed By: Citibank (South Dakota) NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2009
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.