Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 12:44:38 (UTC).

Churgin vs Sam & Son Construction Inc

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 Churgin filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Sam Son Construction Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald L. Styn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald L. Styn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Churgin, Peter

Defendant

Sam & Son Construction Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DiRe, Daniel M

Defendant Attorney

Dougherty, Colleen B

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DANIEL R JACOBS

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT SAM & SON CONSTRUCTION, INC. AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer filed by Sam & Son Construction Inc.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEE DEPOSIT

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Sam & Son Construction Inc.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Churgin, Peter. Refers to: Sam & Son Construction Inc

Notice to Filing Party SD

Answer (Notice of Posting Jury Fee Deposit) submitted by Sam & Son Construction Inc rejected on 02/24/2021.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation to Set Aside Default and Order) filed by Churgin, Peter.

Order - Other

Order - Other (ORDER - Joint Stipulation to Set Aside Default and Order - Signed) filed by Churgin, Peter.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Churgin, Peter. Refers to: Sam & Son Construction Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Churgin, Peter. Refers to: Sam & Son Construction Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Churgin, Peter.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Churgin, Peter.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Sam & Son Construction Inc. Filed By: Sam & Son Construction Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Sam & Son Construction Inc. Filed By: Sam & Son Construction Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (ORDER - Joint Stipulation to Set Aside Default and Order - Signed) filed by Churgin, Peter. Filed By: Churgin, Peter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketThe default has been vacated as to Sam & Son Construction Inc listed on the Complaint filed by Churgin, Peter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Notice of Posting Jury Fee Deposit) submitted by Sam & Son Construction Inc rejected on 02/24/2021. Filed By: Sam & Son Construction Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation to Set Aside Default and Order) filed by Churgin, Peter. Filed By: Churgin, Peter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Churgin, Peter. Refers to: Sam & Son Construction Inc Filed By: Churgin, Peter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Sam & Son Construction Inc on Complaint filed by Churgin, Peter .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Churgin, Peter. Refers to: Sam & Son Construction Inc Filed By: Churgin, Peter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/09/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Churgin, Peter. Refers to: Sam & Son Construction Inc Filed By: Churgin, Peter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Churgin, Peter. Filed By: Churgin, Peter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Churgin, Peter. Filed By: Churgin, Peter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colleen B. Dougherty