This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 07:55:42 (UTC).

Christian-Cantu vs Legoland California LLC

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 Christian-Cantu filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Legoland California LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christian-Cantu, Sarah

Defendants

Legoland California Food and Beverage Trust

Legoland California LLC

Merlin Entertainment Group US Holdigs Inc

Merlin Entertainmnet Short Breaks LLC

Play US Acquisitionco Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph, James

600 B St Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Christian-Cantu, Sarah. Refers to: Legoland California LLC; Legoland California Food and Beverage Trust; Merlin Entertainment Group US Holdigs Inc; Merlin Entertainmnet Short Breaks LLC; Play US Acquisitionco Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Christian-Cantu, Sarah.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Christian-Cantu, Sarah. Refers to: Legoland California LLC; Legoland California Food and Beverage Trust; Merlin Entertainment Group US Holdigs Inc; Merlin Entertainmnet Short Breaks LLC; Play US Acquisitionco Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Christian-Cantu, Sarah. Refers to: Merlin Entertainment Group US Holdigs Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Christian-Cantu, Sarah. Refers to: Legoland California Food and Beverage Trust

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Christian-Cantu, Sarah. Refers to: Merlin Entertainmnet Short Breaks LLC

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Christian-Cantu, Sarah.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Christian-Cantu, Sarah. Refers to: Merlin Entertainmnet Short Breaks LLC Filed By: Christian-Cantu, Sarah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Christian-Cantu, Sarah. Refers to: Legoland California Food and Beverage Trust Filed By: Christian-Cantu, Sarah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Christian-Cantu, Sarah. Refers to: Merlin Entertainment Group US Holdigs Inc Filed By: Christian-Cantu, Sarah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Christian-Cantu, Sarah. Filed By: Christian-Cantu, Sarah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/15/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Christian-Cantu, Sarah. Refers to: Legoland California LLC; Legoland California Food and Beverage Trust; Merlin Entertainment Group US Holdigs Inc; Merlin Entertainmnet Short Breaks LLC; Play US Acquisitionco Inc Filed By: Christian-Cantu, Sarah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Christian-Cantu, Sarah. Refers to: Legoland California LLC; Legoland California Food and Beverage Trust; Merlin Entertainment Group US Holdigs Inc; Merlin Entertainmnet Short Breaks LLC; Play US Acquisitionco Inc Filed By: Christian-Cantu, Sarah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Christian-Cantu, Sarah. Filed By: Christian-Cantu, Sarah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Merlin Entertainments Group US Holding Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Legoland California LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph, James