This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/17/2022 at 04:51:07 (UTC).

Cherrington vs Kia America INC

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 Cherrington filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kia America INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Blaine K. Bowman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Blaine K. Bowman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cherrington, Aaron

Defendants

Kia America INC; AKA : KIA Motors America, INC

Kia Motors America Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cline, Brian K.

Attorney at CLINE APC

7855 Ivanhoe Avenue 408

La Jolla, CA 92037

Defendant Attorney

Nilsen, Ryan L.

550 W C Street Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Cherrington, Aaron. Refers to: Kia America INC; Kia Motors America Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cherrington, Aaron. Refers to: Kia America INC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Cherrington, Aaron. Refers to: Kia America INC

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Cherrington, Aaron. Refers to: Kia America INC

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Kia America INC; Kia Motors America Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-31; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Kia America INC; Kia Motors America Inc.; Filed By: Kia America INC (Defendant); Kia Motors America Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Cherrington, Aaron. Refers to: Kia America INC; Filed By: Cherrington, Aaron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/09/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Blaine K. Bowman.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bowman, Blaine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Cherrington, Aaron. Refers to: Kia America INC; Filed By: Cherrington, Aaron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cherrington, Aaron. Refers to: Kia America INC; Filed By: Cherrington, Aaron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Cherrington, Aaron. Refers to: Kia America INC; Kia Motors America Inc; Filed By: Cherrington, Aaron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kia Motors America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NILSEN RYAN L. ESQ.