Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/17/2021 at 02:46:13 (UTC).

Cheri MacLyman vs Candice Campbell

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 Cheri MacLyman filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Candice Campbell. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MacLyman, Cheri

Respondents

Campbell, Candice

Ciziak, Corbin

Campbell, Candy ; ESA : Campbell, Candice

Ciszak, Corbet

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Schooler, Eugene Andrew

Attorney at SEVENS LEGAL

Respondent Attorney

DiRe, Daniel M

Attorney at DONALD R HOLBEN & ASSOCIATES APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCourt ordered Corbin Ciziak, Corbet Ciszak dismissed with prejudice from the Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/02/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Ciszak, Corbet. Filed By: Ciszak, Corbet (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by MacLyman, Cheri. Filed By: MacLyman, Cheri (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Campbell, Candy. Filed By: Campbell, Candy (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by MacLyman, Cheri. Filed By: MacLyman, Cheri (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by MacLyman, Cheri. Filed By: MacLyman, Cheri (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by MacLyman, Cheri. Filed By: MacLyman, Cheri (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 03/02/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by MacLyman, Cheri. Refers to: Campbell, Candy; Ciziak, Corbin; Ciszak, Corbet Filed By: MacLyman, Cheri (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by MacLyman, Cheri. Refers to: Campbell, Candy; Ciziak, Corbin Filed By: MacLyman, Cheri (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DiRe, Daniel M