This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/25/2020 at 21:43:50 (UTC).

CHDS Inc vs M-Rae Engineering Inc

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 CHDS Inc filed an Other lawsuit against M-Rae Engineering Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHDS Inc

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Wesco Insurance Company

Surety Associates of Southern California

Otay Water District

M-Rae Engineering Inc

Defendants and Cross Defendants

M-Rae Engineering Inc

Constance, Joel David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Parkman, Sharmila R

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Sosa, Carlos E

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF HAUSMAN & SOSA LLP

Blumenfeld, Jeanne

Attorney at ARTIANO SHINOFF

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by CHDS Inc. Refers to: M-Rae Engineering Inc; Wesco Insurance Company; Surety Associates of Southern California; Otay Water District

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by CHDS Inc. Refers to: Surety Associates of Southern California

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by CHDS Inc. Refers to: Wesco Insurance Company

Dismissal-XC

Request for Dismissal (without prejudice as to Wesco Insurance Company Cross Complaint) filed by Wesco Insurance Company.

Defendant Otay Water District's Answer to CHDS, Inc.'s Complaint for Damages and Declaratory Relief

Answer filed by Otay Water District.

General Denial

General Denial filed by Wesco Insurance Company.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Wesco Insurance Company. Refers to: Constance, Joel; M-Rae Engineering Inc

Summons-XC

Original Summons filed by Wesco Insurance Company.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by CHDS Inc. Refers to: Otay Water District

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service filed by CHDS Inc.

Notice to Public Entity of Commencement of Action on Stop Payment Notice Claim

Notice - Other (Notice to Public Entity of Commencement of Action on Stop Payment Notice Claim) filed by CHDS Inc.

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by CHDS Inc. Refers to: M-Rae Engineering Inc; Wesco Insurance Company; Surety Associates of Southern California; Otay Water District

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CHDS Inc. Refers to: M-Rae Engineering Inc; Wesco Insurance Company; Surety Associates of Southern California; Otay Water District

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by CHDS Inc. Refers to: M-Rae Engineering Inc; Wesco Insurance Company; Surety Associates of Southern California; Otay Water District

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Errata Regarding Complaint

Notice of Errata filed by CHDS Inc.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/01/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed by CHDS Inc. Refers to: M-Rae Engineering Inc; Wesco Insurance Company; Surety Associates of Southern California; Otay Water District Filed By: CHDS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Otay Water District.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Wesco Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to M-Rae Engineering Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Surety Associates of Southern California.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to CHDS Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Otay Water District. Filed By: Otay Water District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (without prejudice as to Wesco Insurance Company Cross Complaint) filed by Wesco Insurance Company. Filed By: Wesco Insurance Company (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Wesco Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by CHDS Inc. Filed By: CHDS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (Notice to Public Entity of Commencement of Action on Stop Payment Notice Claim) filed by CHDS Inc. Filed By: CHDS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/01/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Errata filed by CHDS Inc. Filed By: CHDS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by CHDS Inc. Refers to: M-Rae Engineering Inc; Wesco Insurance Company; Surety Associates of Southern California; Otay Water District Filed By: CHDS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by CHDS Inc. Refers to: M-Rae Engineering Inc; Wesco Insurance Company; Surety Associates of Southern California; Otay Water District Filed By: CHDS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by CHDS Inc. Refers to: M-Rae Engineering Inc; Wesco Insurance Company; Surety Associates of Southern California; Otay Water District Filed By: CHDS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHDS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where OTAY WATER DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOSA, CARLOS E