This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/07/2022 at 06:04:02 (UTC).

Chang vs San Dieguito Union High School District

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 Chang filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against San Dieguito Union High School District. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew C. Braner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Matthew C. Braner

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CHANG, CAROL

Montes, Lisa

Respondent

San Dieguito Union High School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Briggs, Cory Jay

99 E C Street 111

Upland, CA 91786

Respondent Attorney

Winet, Randall L.

1215 W Vista Way

Vista, CA 92083

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by CHANG, CAROL; Montes, Lisa.

Proof of Service of SDUHSD's Motion to Dismiss

Proof of Service filed by San Dieguito Union High School District.

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss

Proposed Order submitted by San Dieguito Union High School District received but not filed on 08/25/2022.

OF TINA DOUGLAS

Declaration - Other (OF TINA DOUGLAS) filed by San Dieguito Union High School District.

of Randall L Winet

Declaration - Other (of Randall L Winet) filed by San Dieguito Union High School District.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Dismiss by SDUHSD

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by San Dieguito Union High School District.

Motion to Dismiss by SDUHSD

Motion to Dismiss filed by San Dieguito Union High School District.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 09/22/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 07/28/2022 08:30:00 AM.

Order on Media Request to Permit Coverage

Order on Media Request to Permit Coverage filed by CHANG, CAROL; San Dieguito Union High School District.

Media Request to Photograph, Record, or Broadcast

Media Request to Photograph, Record, or Broadcast filed by CHANG, CAROL; San Dieguito Union High School District.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 04/27/2022 08:30:00 AM.

Proof of Service of Motion for Protective Order by SDUHSD

Proof of Service filed by San Dieguito Union High School District.

Proposed Order Granting Motion for Protective Order by SDUHSD

Proposed Order submitted by San Dieguito Union High School District received but not filed on 04/11/2022.

Notice of Lodgment ISO Motion for Protective Order by SDUHSD

Notice of Lodgment filed by San Dieguito Union High School District.

Declaration of Randall L. Winet ISO Motion for Protective Order by SDUHSD

Declaration - Other (of Randall L. Winet) filed by San Dieguito Union High School District.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion for Protective Order by SDUHSD

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by San Dieguito Union High School District.

Notice of Motion for Protective Order by SDUHSD

Motion for Protective Order filed by San Dieguito Union High School District.

22 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-60; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil) - Motion to Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-60; Event Type: OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-60; Event Type: Ex Parte

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by CHANG, CAROL; Montes, Lisa.; Filed By: CHANG, CAROL (Petitioner); Montes, Lisa (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 09/07/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by San Dieguito Union High School District.; Filed By: San Dieguito Union High School District (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by San Dieguito Union High School District received but not filed on 08/25/2022.; Filed By: San Dieguito Union High School District (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (OF TINA DOUGLAS) filed by San Dieguito Union High School District.; Filed By: San Dieguito Union High School District (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Randall L Winet) filed by San Dieguito Union High School District.; Filed By: San Dieguito Union High School District (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities filed by San Dieguito Union High School District.; Filed By: San Dieguito Union High School District (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by San Dieguito Union High School District.; Filed By: San Dieguito Union High School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by San Dieguito Union High School District.; Filed By: San Dieguito Union High School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition - Other filed by San Dieguito Union High School District.; Filed By: San Dieguito Union High School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (to Authorize Immediate Discovery and Accelerate Trial) filed by CHANG, CAROL; Montes, Lisa.; Filed By: CHANG, CAROL (Petitioner); Montes, Lisa (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 03/02/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Braner, Matthew.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by CHANG, CAROL; Montes, Lisa. Refers to: San Dieguito Union High School District; Filed By: CHANG, CAROL (Petitioner); Montes, Lisa (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by CHANG, CAROL; Montes, Lisa. Refers to: San Dieguito Union High School District; Filed By: CHANG, CAROL (Petitioner); Montes, Lisa (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate filed by CHANG, CAROL; Montes, Lisa. Refers to: San Dieguito Union High School District; Filed By: CHANG, CAROL (Petitioner); Montes, Lisa (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN DIEGUITO UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINET RANDALL LAWRENCE