This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/07/2018 at 09:05:49 (UTC).

Cerriteno vs. Castaneda

Case Summary

On 04/03/2014 Cerriteno filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Castaneda. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cerriteno, Vicente

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Castaneda, Ranulfo

Espinoza, Angel

Espinoza, Yadira

ESPINOZA, ANGEL ; AKA : ESPINOSA, ANGEL

ESPINOZA, YADIRA ; AKA : ESPINOSA, YADIRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIDES, CLAY R

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF CLAY R SIDES

120 S Main Ave

Fallbrook, CA 92028

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

OBERRECHT, KIMBERLY S

Attorney at HORTON OBERRECHT KIRKPATRICK & MARTHA

225 Broadway #2200

San Diego, CA 92101

SCHRIEFFER, PAUL

100 N Barranca St #1100

West Covina, CA 91791

 

Court Documents

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Espinoza, Angel; Espinoza, Yadira. Refers to: Castaneda, Ranulfo

Answer

Answer filed by Castaneda, Ranulfo.

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (10/17/14-MOTION TO STRIKE) filed by Cerriteno, Vicente.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 10/17/2014 01:30:00 PM.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Castaneda, Ranulfo.

Mediation Selection Form

Mediation Selection Form filed by Cerriteno, Vicente.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - nonagreement

Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - nonagreement filed by PLOTKIN, BARRY M.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Cerriteno, Vicente. Refers to: Espinoza, Angel; Espinoza, Yadira

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Espinoza, Angel; Espinoza, Yadira.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (as to Cross-Defendants ANGEL ESPINOZA and YADIRA ESPINOZA only) filed by Castaneda, Ranulfo. Refers to: Espinoza, Angel; Espinoza, Yadira

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL) filed by Castaneda, Ranulfo. Refers to: Espinoza, Angel; Espinoza, Yadira

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 09/11/2015 10:15:00 AM.

Advance Trial Review Order

Advance Trial Review Order filed by Castaneda, Ranulfo; Cerriteno, Vicente. Refers to: Espinoza, Angel; Espinoza, Yadira

Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine (PLAINTIFF 1-3) filed by Cerriteno, Vicente.

Response

Response (To Motion in Limine 1-3) filed by Cerriteno, Vicente.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 11/13/2015 08:30:00 AM.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Cerriteno, Vicente.

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Cerriteno, Vicente. Filed By: Cerriteno, Vicente (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 11/13/2015 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 11/13/2015 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • The Civil Jury Trial was rescheduled to 11/13/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in N-31 before Timothy M. Casserly at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other (TO CONTINUE TRIAL) filed by Cerriteno, Vicente; Castaneda, Ranulfo. Filed By: Cerriteno, Vicente (Plaintiff); Castaneda, Ranulfo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Opposition to Motion in Limine (9/25/15 MIL 1 and 2) filed by Castaneda, Ranulfo. Filed By: Castaneda, Ranulfo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Response (To Motion in Limine 1-3) filed by Cerriteno, Vicente. Filed By: Cerriteno, Vicente (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion in Limine (DEFENDANTS 1-3) filed by Castaneda, Ranulfo. Filed By: Castaneda, Ranulfo (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Trial Brief filed by Cerriteno, Vicente. Filed By: Cerriteno, Vicente (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Castaneda, Ranulfo. Filed By: Castaneda, Ranulfo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/09/2015 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 01/09/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in N-31 before Timothy M. Casserly at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/26/2014 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cerriteno, Vicente. Refers to: Castaneda, Ranulfo; Espinoza, Angel; Espinoza, Yadira Filed By: Cerriteno, Vicente (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Cerriteno, Vicente. Refers to: Castaneda, Ranulfo; Espinoza, Angel; Espinoza, Yadira Filed By: Cerriteno, Vicente (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Cerriteno, Vicente. Refers to: Castaneda, Ranulfo; Espinoza, Angel; Espinoza, Yadira Filed By: Cerriteno, Vicente (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.