This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/22/2022 at 03:00:26 (UTC).

Cecena vs Target Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 Cecena filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cecena, Herman

Defendant

Target Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Irvin, Chad

Attorney at GULDJIAN FASEL

3080 Bristol St Suite 380

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant Attorney

Schulz, Peter J.

One America Plaza, 600 W Broadway #960

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Cecena, Herman. Refers to: Target Corporation

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cecena, Herman. Refers to: Target Corporation

Summons

Original Summons filed by Cecena, Herman. Refers to: Target Corporation

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Answer

Answer filed by Target Corporation.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Target Corporation.

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Target Corporation.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Target Corporation.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/13/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Target Corporation.; Filed By: Target Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Target Corporation.; Filed By: Target Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Target Corporation.; Filed By: Target Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Target Corporation.; Filed By: Target Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/13/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Cecena, Herman. Refers to: Target Corporation; Filed By: Cecena, Herman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cecena, Herman. Refers to: Target Corporation; Filed By: Cecena, Herman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Cecena, Herman. Refers to: Target Corporation; Filed By: Cecena, Herman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHULZ PETER J.