This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 02:11:23 (UTC).

CECENA vs COUNTRY WINE AND SPIRITS INC

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 CECENA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTRY WINE AND SPIRITS INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CECENA, IAN

Defendant

COUNTRY WINE AND SPIRITS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LaFontaine, Ashley V

Defendant Attorney

Brouses, Bernadette C

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/20/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CECENA, IAN. Refers to: COUNTRY WINE AND SPIRITS INC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by CECENA, IAN. Refers to: COUNTRY WINE AND SPIRITS INC

Complaint

Complaint filed by CECENA, IAN. Refers to: COUNTRY WINE AND SPIRITS INC

Defendant Country Wine and Spirits Inc Answer to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial

Answer filed by COUNTRY WINE AND SPIRITS INC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by CECENA, IAN. Refers to: COUNTRY WINE AND SPIRITS INC

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/20/2021 09:30:00 AM.

Defendant's Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Notice - Other (Posting Jury Fees) filed by COUNTRY WINE AND SPIRITS INC.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by CECENA, IAN.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by CECENA, IAN.

Defendant's Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by COUNTRY WINE AND SPIRITS INC.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to stipulation to 01/21/2022 at 09:30AM before Judge Richard S. Whitney.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/20/2021 09:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (Posting Jury Fees) filed by COUNTRY WINE AND SPIRITS INC. Filed By: COUNTRY WINE AND SPIRITS INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by CECENA, IAN. Filed By: CECENA, IAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by CECENA, IAN. Filed By: CECENA, IAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by COUNTRY WINE AND SPIRITS INC. Filed By: COUNTRY WINE AND SPIRITS INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by COUNTRY WINE AND SPIRITS INC. Filed By: COUNTRY WINE AND SPIRITS INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by CECENA, IAN. Refers to: COUNTRY WINE AND SPIRITS INC Filed By: CECENA, IAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/20/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by CECENA, IAN. Refers to: COUNTRY WINE AND SPIRITS INC Filed By: CECENA, IAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by CECENA, IAN. Refers to: COUNTRY WINE AND SPIRITS INC Filed By: CECENA, IAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by CECENA, IAN. Refers to: COUNTRY WINE AND SPIRITS INC Filed By: CECENA, IAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less