This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/17/2020 at 03:52:38 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I LLC vs Senecal

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Cavalry SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Senecal. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I LLC

Defendant

Senecal, David M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chrisos, Alexa A

Attorney at QUALL CARDOT LLP

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Senecal, David

Complaint

Complaint filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Senecal, David

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Senecal, David

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Senecal, David

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Senecal, David Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/18/2020 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Senecal, David Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Senecal, David Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Senecal, David Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.