This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/05/2019 at 09:40:32 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I LLC vs. Rainey

Case Summary

On 03/21/2012 Cavalry SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rainey. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I LLC

Defendant

Rainey, Marissa D; AKA : Rainey, Marissa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Winn, Brian N

Attorney at WINN LAW GROUP APC

110 East Wilshire Avenue 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Rainey, Marissa

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Rainey, Marissa

Statement of Venue

Statement of Venue filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Rainey, Marissa

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Rainey, Marissa

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Rainey, Marissa

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Rainey, Marissa

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC.

Judgment by Default by Court

Judgment by Default by Court filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Rainey, Marissa

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Rainey, Marissa

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Rainey, Marissa Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • *****Writ Received*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Cavalry SPV I LLC and against Rainey, Marissa D for $ 6547.99, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 1816.85, prejudgment costs: $ 300.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 8664.84.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Court filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Rainey, Marissa Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • The default filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC was entered as to Rainey, Marissa D on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 . Override feature used.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Rainey, Marissa Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • Court Judgment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Rainey, Marissa Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2012
  • Case assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Venue filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less