This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/30/2019 at 15:23:21 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank vs. Jerrain

Case Summary

On 06/01/2012 Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jerrain. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank

Defendant

Jerrain, Jessica F; AKA : Jerrain, Jessica

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jensen, Casey M

Attorney at WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

110 East Wilshire Avenue 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest fil

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank.

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank.

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank. Refers to: Jerrain, Jessica

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank. Refers to: Jerrain, Jessica

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank.

Statement of Venue

Statement of Venue filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank. Refers to: Jerrain, Jessica

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does (Does 1-10) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank.

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank. Refers to: Jerrain, Jessica

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank. Refers to: Jerrain, Jessica

Judgment by Default by Court

Judgment by Default by Court filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank. Refers to: Jerrain, Jessica

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank.

Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank. Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank. Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank. Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank. Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • *****WRIT RECEIVED*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank and against Jerrain, Jessica F for $ 5650.04, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 900.00, interest: $ 2135.90, prejudgment costs: $ 280.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 8965.94.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Court filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank. Refers to: Jerrain, Jessica Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • Default entered as to Jerrain, Jessica F on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank .

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does (Does 1-10) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank. Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • COURT judgment rec'd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank. Refers to: Jerrain, Jessica Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Venue filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank. Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank. Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • Case assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank. Refers to: Jerrain, Jessica Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank. Refers to: Jerrain, Jessica Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Wells Fargo Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less