This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/02/2019 at 16:29:51 (UTC).

Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC vs. Olivia A Sanabria

Case Summary

On 10/12/2010 Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Olivia A Sanabria. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC

Defendant

SANABRIA, OLIVIA A; AKA : SANABRIA, OLIVIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN, BRIAN N

Attorney at WINN LAW GROUP APC

110 East Wilshire Avenue 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution - Sacramento

Writ of Execution issued.

Claim of Exemption - Notice of Hearing

Claim of Exemption - Notice of Hearing (and Supporting Documents) filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC. Refers to: Sanabria, Olivia

Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 1 of 1

Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 1 of 1

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Bank Levy -Notice of Levy, Memo of Garnishee copy of) filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC.

Order Determining Claim of Exemption

Order Determining Claim of Exemption filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC.

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC.

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution issued.

Claim of Exemption - Notice of Opposition

Claim of Exemption - Notice of Opposition filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC.

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution issued.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest fil

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Opposition to Claim of Exemption - Levy (Civil) heard 02/06/2018 02:00:00 PM.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC. Filed By: Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC. Filed By: Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Determining Claim of Exemption filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC. Filed By: Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Opposition to Claim of Exemption - Levy (Civil) heard 02/06/2018 02:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Claim of exemption is Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Claim of Exemption - Notice of Opposition filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC. Filed By: Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Claim of Exemption - Notice of Hearing (and Supporting Documents) filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC. Filed By: Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Opposition to Claim of Exemption - Levy (Civil) scheduled for 02/06/2018 at 02:00:00 PM at Central in 903 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service (Bank Levy -Notice of Levy, Memo of Garnishee copy of) filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC. Filed By: Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2011
  • Location changed from Civil Business Office to Dept. 4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • Case located in Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • The default filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC was entered as to Sanabria, Olivia A on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 . Override feature used.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC. Refers to: Sanabria, Olivia Filed By: Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • Case located in Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC. Refers to: Sanabria, Olivia Filed By: Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC. Refers to: Sanabria, Olivia Filed By: Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC. Refers to: Sanabria, Olivia Filed By: Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.