This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 11:32:54 (UTC).

Castellanos vs Southwest Security Patrol Inc

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Castellanos filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Southwest Security Patrol Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald L. Styn and Keri Katz. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ronald L. Styn

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Castellanos, Alexander

Allen Gray, Douglas Alonzo

Muana, Robert

Defendant

Southwest Security Patrol Inc; DBA : Southwest Patrol

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lapuyade, Jean-Claude

Attorney at JCL LAW FIRM APC

3990 Old Town Ave Suite C204

San Diego, CA 92110

Zakay, Shani O

Attorney at ZAKAY LAW GROUP APC

5440 Morehouse Drive 3600

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Styn,Ronald to Katz,Keri effective 04/17/2021

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Castellanos, Alexander.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/20/2021 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Motion and Supporting Declarations

Motion for Approval of Class Settlement filed by Castellanos, Alexander.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Castellanos, Alexander.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Jean Claude Lapuyade) filed by Castellanos, Alexander.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Shani O. Zakay) filed by Castellanos, Alexander.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Adam Rose) filed by Castellanos, Alexander.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Alexander Castellanos) filed by Castellanos, Alexander.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order submitted by Castellanos, Alexander received but not filed on 10/06/2021.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Castellanos, Alexander.

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Castellanos, Alexander.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Castellanos, Alexander.

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Castellanos, Alexander.

Stipulation - Other

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint and Order) filed by Castellanos, Alexander; Southwest Security Patrol Inc.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Castellanos, Alexander; Muana, Robert; Allen Gray, Douglas Alonzo. Refers to: Southwest Security Patrol Inc

Proposed Order

Order - Other (Granting Stipulation to File a First Amended Complaint) filed by Castellanos, Alexander.

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketMatter decided.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to Court's motion to 04/28/2022 at 11:00AM before Judge Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/09/2021 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMatter taken under submission.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 11/09/2021 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/19/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Castellanos, Alexander. Refers to: Southwest Security Patrol Inc Filed By: Castellanos, Alexander (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Castellanos, Alexander. Refers to: Southwest Security Patrol Inc Filed By: Castellanos, Alexander (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Castellanos, Alexander. Filed By: Castellanos, Alexander (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHWEST PATROL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZAKAY, SHANI O.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAPUYADE, JEAN-CLAUDE