This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 01:49:05 (UTC).

Castellanos VS Pickford Real Estate Inc

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Castellanos filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Pickford Real Estate Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald L. Styn and Keri Katz. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ronald L. Styn

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Castellanos, Lizbeth

Defendants

Nolan, Grace A

Pickford Real Estate Inc

PICKFORD REALTY LTD

Bell, John

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Romero, Amalea

Cristol-Deman, Liza

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Styn,Ronald to Katz,Keri effective 04/17/2021

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (Not Entered) filed by Castellanos, Lizbeth.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Castellanos, Lizbeth.

Notice of Lodgment

Notice of Lodgment (Notice of Intent to Lodge Documents - Settlement Agreement) filed by Castellanos, Lizbeth.

Notice of Lodgment

Notice of Lodgment (Notice of Intent to Lodge Documents - Settlement Agreement - Unredacted) filed by Castellanos, Lizbeth.

Order - Other

Order - Other (Consent Decree - Signed -) filed by Castellanos, Lizbeth.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Castellanos, Lizbeth. Refers to: Bell, John

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Castellanos, Lizbeth. Refers to: Pickford Real Estate Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Castellanos, Lizbeth. Refers to: PICKFORD REALTY LTD

Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance filed by Castellanos, Lizbeth.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Castellanos, Lizbeth.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

[A document for ROA# 4]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Order on Court Fee Waiver

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[A document for ROA# 8]

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Castellanos, Lizbeth. Filed By: Castellanos, Lizbeth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Pickford Real Estate Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to PICKFORD REALTY LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Bell, John .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Nolan, Grace A .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Castellanos, Lizbeth .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Not Entered) filed by Castellanos, Lizbeth. Filed By: Castellanos, Lizbeth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Castellanos, Lizbeth. Filed By: Castellanos, Lizbeth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Styn,Ronald to Katz,Keri effective 04/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (NOT ENTERED) filed by Castellanos, Lizbeth. Filed By: Castellanos, Lizbeth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 8]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 8]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 8]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Castellanos, Lizbeth. Refers to: Pickford Real Estate Inc; PICKFORD REALTY LTD; Bell, John; Nolan, Grace Filed By: Castellanos, Lizbeth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 2]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Castellanos, Lizbeth. Filed By: Castellanos, Lizbeth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Castellanos, Lizbeth. Filed By: Castellanos, Lizbeth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PICKFORD REALTY LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where Pickford Real Estate , INC; DBA : Berkshire Hathaway Homeservices California Properties is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cristol-Deman, Liza