This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/19/2022 at 07:13:22 (UTC).

CASHCALL INC VS HENDRIX

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 CASHCALL INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HENDRIX. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Loren G. Freestone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Loren G. Freestone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASHCALL INC

Defendant

HENDRIX, ROCHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORAN, TREVOR G.

Attorney at MULVANEY BARRY BEATTY LINN & MAYERS LLP

401 W A Street 17Th Flr

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 (Case Initiation)

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by CASHCALL INC. Refers to: HENDRIX, ROCHELLE

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CASHCALL INC. Refers to: HENDRIX, ROCHELLE

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by CASHCALL INC. Refers to: HENDRIX, ROCHELLE

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by CASHCALL INC.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 07/30/2022.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 07/30/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by CASHCALL INC.; Filed By: CASHCALL INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by CASHCALL INC. Refers to: HENDRIX, ROCHELLE; Filed By: CASHCALL INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by CASHCALL INC. Refers to: HENDRIX, ROCHELLE; Filed By: CASHCALL INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by CASHCALL INC. Refers to: HENDRIX, ROCHELLE; Filed By: CASHCALL INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASHCALL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trevor G Moran