This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/24/2023 at 08:10:11 (UTC).

Opel vs. Subaru of America Inc

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 Opel filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Subaru of America Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Opel, Cary F.

Defendant

Subaru of America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McGee, William R.

Wallace-Tracy, Deanna

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Opel, Cary F.. Refers to: Subaru of America, Inc.

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Opel, Cary F.. Refers to: Subaru of America, Inc.

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Opel, Cary F.. Refers to: Subaru of America, Inc.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Opel, Cary F..

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/28/2023 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Opel, Cary F..; Filed By: Opel, Cary F. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Opel, Cary F. .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Subaru of America, Inc..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/28/2023 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Opel, Cary F.. Refers to: Subaru of America, Inc.; Filed By: Opel, Cary F. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Opel, Cary F.. Refers to: Subaru of America, Inc.; Filed By: Opel, Cary F. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Opel, Cary F.. Refers to: Subaru of America, Inc.; Filed By: Opel, Cary F. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less