This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/26/2023 at 01:35:31 (UTC).

AYALA VS DEXCOM INC

Case Summary

On 04/28/2023 AYALA filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against DEXCOM INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ayala, Trisha

Defendant

Dexcom Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clark, Timothy M

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Ayala, Trisha. Refers to: Dexcom Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ayala, Trisha. Refers to: Dexcom Inc

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Ayala, Trisha. Refers to: Dexcom Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Ayala, Trisha.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2024
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Ayala, Trisha.; Filed By: Ayala, Trisha (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/05/2024 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Caietti, Carolyn.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Ayala, Trisha. Refers to: Dexcom Inc; Filed By: Ayala, Trisha (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ayala, Trisha. Refers to: Dexcom Inc; Filed By: Ayala, Trisha (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Ayala, Trisha. Refers to: Dexcom Inc; Filed By: Ayala, Trisha (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less