This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/17/2023 at 02:10:26 (UTC).

Estate of Linda M. Coakley

Case Summary

On 04/26/2023 Estate of Linda M Coakley was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John B Scherling. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John B Scherling

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Administrator

Coakley, Steven

Decedent

Coakley, Linda M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Administrator Attorneys

Greco, David G

Delaney, Stephanie K

 

Court Documents

Petition for Letters of Administration

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Coakley, Steven. Refers to: Coakley, Linda; Coakley, Steven

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Coakley, Steven.

Proposed Order

[A document for ROA# 3]

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 07/19/2023 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 502 John B Scherling.

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by Coakley, Steven.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Coakley, Steven.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Coakley, Steven.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Coakley, Steven; Coakley, Steven.

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication filed by Coakley, Steven.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2023
  • HearingLocation: 502; Event Type: Petition for Probate - Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication filed by Coakley, Steven.; Filed By: Coakley, Steven (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Coakley, Steven; Coakley, Steven.; Filed By: Coakley, Steven (Petitioner); Coakley, Steven (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Coakley, Steven.; Filed By: Coakley, Steven (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Coakley, Steven.; Filed By: Coakley, Steven (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by Coakley, Steven.; Filed By: Coakley, Steven (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate scheduled for 07/19/2023 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 502 John B Scherling.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Scherling, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Proposed] Order (Order for Probate) submitted by Coakley, Steven received but not filed on 04/26/2023.; Filed By: Coakley, Steven (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Coakley, Steven.; Filed By: Coakley, Steven (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Coakley, Steven. Refers to: Coakley, Linda; Coakley, Steven; Filed By: Coakley, Steven (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less