This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/01/2023 at 08:05:13 (UTC).

Remy vs Turman

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 Remy filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Turman. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keri Katz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Remy, Kaitlynn

Defendants

Turman, Barbara

Turman, Todd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Facchetti, Adrianos

Tedford, James Robert

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Remy, Kaitlynn. Refers to: Turman, Todd; Turman, Barbara

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Remy, Kaitlynn. Refers to: Turman, Barbara; Turman, Barbara

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Remy, Kaitlynn. Refers to: Turman, Barbara; Turman, Barbara

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Remy, Kaitlynn. Refers to: Turman, Barbara

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Remy, Kaitlynn; Remy, Kaitlynn. Refers to: Turman, Todd

Proof of Service of Statement of Damages

Proof of Service of Statement of Damages filed by Remy, Kaitlynn.

Proof of Service of Statement of Damages

Proof of Service of Statement of Damages filed by Remy, Kaitlynn; Remy, Kaitlynn.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Statement of Damages filed by Remy, Kaitlynn; Remy, Kaitlynn.; Filed By: Remy, Kaitlynn (Plaintiff); Remy, Kaitlynn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Statement of Damages filed by Remy, Kaitlynn.; Filed By: Remy, Kaitlynn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Remy, Kaitlynn; Remy, Kaitlynn. Refers to: Turman, Todd; Filed By: Remy, Kaitlynn (Plaintiff); Remy, Kaitlynn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Remy, Kaitlynn. Refers to: Turman, Barbara; Filed By: Remy, Kaitlynn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/14/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Katz, Keri.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Remy, Kaitlynn. Refers to: Turman, Barbara; Turman, Barbara; Filed By: Remy, Kaitlynn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Remy, Kaitlynn. Refers to: Turman, Barbara; Turman, Barbara; Filed By: Remy, Kaitlynn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Remy, Kaitlynn. Refers to: Turman, Todd; Turman, Barbara; Filed By: Remy, Kaitlynn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less