This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/31/2023 at 05:48:03 (UTC).

Juarez vs 6 Star Properties LP

Case Summary

On 04/03/2023 Juarez filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 6 Star Properties LP. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Juarez, Victoria

Ornelas, Aaliyah

Defendants

6 Star Properties LP

Avenue5 California Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Williams, Matthew T

Defendant Attorney

Webb, Lane E

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Juarez, Victoria; Ornelas, Aaliyah. Refers to: 6 Star Properties LP; Avenue5 California Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Juarez, Victoria; Ornelas, Aaliyah. Refers to: 6 Star Properties LP; Avenue5 California Inc

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Aaliyah Ornelas)

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Juarez, Victoria; Ornelas, Aaliyah.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Victoria Juarez)

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Juarez, Victoria; Ornelas, Aaliyah.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 10]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[Another document for ROA# 10]

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Aaliyah Ornelas)

[Another document for ROA# 10]

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Victoria Juarez)

[Another document for ROA# 10]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Answer

Answer filed by 6 Star Properties LP; Avenue5 California Inc.

 

Docket Entries

11/03/2023

HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer filed by 6 Star Properties LP; Avenue5 California Inc.; Filed By: 6 Star Properties LP (Defendant); Avenue5 California Inc (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket[Another document for ROA# 10]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket[Another document for ROA# 10]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket[Another document for ROA# 10]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket[Another document for ROA# 10]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCase initiation form printed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/03/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Juarez, Victoria; Ornelas, Aaliyah.; Filed By: Juarez, Victoria (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Juarez, Victoria; Ornelas, Aaliyah.; Filed By: Ornelas, Aaliyah (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023

DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023

DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Juarez, Victoria; Ornelas, Aaliyah.; Filed By: Juarez, Victoria (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023

DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Juarez, Victoria; Ornelas, Aaliyah.; Filed By: Ornelas, Aaliyah (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Juarez, Victoria; Ornelas, Aaliyah. Refers to: 6 Star Properties LP; Avenue5 California Inc; Filed By: Juarez, Victoria (Plaintiff); Ornelas, Aaliyah (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint filed by Juarez, Victoria; Ornelas, Aaliyah. Refers to: 6 Star Properties LP; Avenue5 California Inc; Filed By: Juarez, Victoria (Plaintiff); Ornelas, Aaliyah (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less