This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/29/2023 at 08:40:33 (UTC).

The Vons Companies INC vs. Gregory Martinez

Case Summary

On 05/08/2023 The Vons Companies INC filed an Other lawsuit against Gregory Martinez. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-EC

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

The Vons Companies INC

Respondent

Martinez, Gregory

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Dahlberg, John N

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • HearingLocation: E-21; Event Type: Hearing on Restraining Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 05/24/2023 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCourt's own request to continue the Hearing on Restraining Order and reissue the temporary orders was granted. The Hearing on Restraining Order was continued to 07/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department E-21.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by The Vons Companies INC. Refers to: Dang, Destin; Martinez, Gregory; Brazwell, Julie; Crane, John; Dahlberg, John; Filed By: The Vons Companies INC (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance filed by The Vons Companies INC.; Filed By: The Vons Companies INC (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Personal Service) filed by The Vons Companies INC. Refers to: Dang, Destin; Martinez, Gregory; Brazwell, Julie; Crane, John; Dahlberg, John; Filed By: The Vons Companies INC (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 05/24/2023 at 09:00:00 AM at East County in E-21 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by The Vons Companies INC. Refers to: Dang, Destin; Martinez, Gregory; Brazwell, Julie; Crane, John; Dahlberg, John; Filed By: The Vons Companies INC (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by The Vons Companies INC. Refers to: Dang, Destin; Martinez, Gregory; Brazwell, Julie; Crane, John; Dahlberg, John; Filed By: The Vons Companies INC (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Department E-21.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketPetition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders filed by The Vons Companies INC. Refers to: Dang, Destin; Martinez, Gregory; Dahlberg, John; Brazwell, Julie; Crane, John; Filed By: The Vons Companies INC (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less