This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/25/2023 at 16:46:02 (UTC).

Figueroa vs BioLife Plasma Services LP

Case Summary

On 08/01/2023 Figueroa filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BioLife Plasma Services LP. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Loren G. Freestone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Loren G. Freestone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Figueroa, Rosa Yareli

Defendants

BioLife Plasma Services LP

Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ferraro, Nicholas J

Vega, Lauren Nicole

Defendant Attorney

Bifoss, Bailey

 

Court Documents

Class Action Complaint

Complaint filed by Figueroa, Rosa Yareli. Refers to: BioLife Plasma Services LP; Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Figueroa, Rosa Yareli. Refers to: BioLife Plasma Services LP; Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Figueroa, Rosa Yareli. Refers to: BioLife Plasma Services LP; Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Figueroa, Rosa Yareli. Refers to: Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Figueroa, Rosa Yareli; Figueroa, Rosa Yareli. Refers to: BioLife Plasma Services LP

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by BioLife Plasma Services LP; Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA INC.

 

Docket Entries

01/12/2024

HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer filed by BioLife Plasma Services LP; Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA INC.; Filed By: BioLife Plasma Services LP (Defendant); Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA INC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Figueroa, Rosa Yareli; Figueroa, Rosa Yareli. Refers to: BioLife Plasma Services LP; Filed By: Figueroa, Rosa Yareli (Plaintiff); Figueroa, Rosa Yareli (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Figueroa, Rosa Yareli. Refers to: Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA INC; Filed By: Figueroa, Rosa Yareli (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023

DocketSummons issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCase initiation form printed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/12/2024 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 Loren G. Freestone.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Freestone, Loren.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Summons filed by Figueroa, Rosa Yareli. Refers to: BioLife Plasma Services LP; Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA INC; Filed By: Figueroa, Rosa Yareli (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Figueroa, Rosa Yareli. Refers to: BioLife Plasma Services LP; Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA INC; Filed By: Figueroa, Rosa Yareli (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint filed by Figueroa, Rosa Yareli. Refers to: BioLife Plasma Services LP; Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA INC; Filed By: Figueroa, Rosa Yareli (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less