This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/11/2020 at 10:36:19 (UTC).

Carus vs. Victoria Post Acute Care

Case Summary

On 09/10/2019 Carus filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Victoria Post Acute Care. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carus, Jesus

Defendants

Anza Healthcare Inc; DBA : Victoria Post Acute Care

Victoria Post Acute Care

Anza Healthcare Inc; DBA : Victoria Post Acute Care;ESA : Victoria Post Acute Care

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Drelich, Matan

Attorney at THE DRELICH LAW FIRM PC

Chivinski, Andrew R

Attorney at CHIVINSKI LAW FIRM APC

Defendant Attorney

Graves, Alan B

Attorney at NEIL DYMOTT FRANK MCCABE & HUDSON

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Carus, Jesus. Refers to: Victoria Post Acute Care; Anza Healthcare Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Carus, Jesus. Refers to: Victoria Post Acute Care; Anza Healthcare Inc

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (First) filed by Carus, Jesus. Refers to: Anza Healthcare Inc; Victoria Post Acute Care

Answer to First Amended Complaint on Behalf of Defendant Anza Healthcare, Inc. dba Victoria Post Acute Care

Answer filed by Anza Healthcare Inc.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Carus, Jesus. Refers to: Victoria Post Acute Care; Anza Healthcare Inc

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Anza Healthcare Inc.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Anza Healthcare Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Anza Healthcare Inc.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 09/25/2020 at 09:30:00 AM in C-68 before Richard S. Whitney at Central.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Anza Healthcare Inc. Filed By: Anza Healthcare Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Anza Healthcare Inc. Filed By: Anza Healthcare Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Anza Healthcare Inc. Filed By: Anza Healthcare Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 09/25/2020 at 09:30:00 AM in C-68 before Richard S. Whitney at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Anza Healthcare Inc. Filed By: Anza Healthcare Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Carus, Jesus. Refers to: Victoria Post Acute Care; Anza Healthcare Inc Filed By: Carus, Jesus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First) filed by Carus, Jesus. Refers to: Anza Healthcare Inc; Victoria Post Acute Care Filed By: Carus, Jesus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Carus, Jesus. Refers to: Victoria Post Acute Care; Anza Healthcare Inc Filed By: Carus, Jesus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Carus, Jesus. Refers to: Victoria Post Acute Care; Anza Healthcare Inc Filed By: Carus, Jesus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/22/2020 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Anza Healthcare Inc; DBA : VICTORIA POST ACUTE CARE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Graves, Alan B