This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 08:15:13 (UTC).

Carter vs Office Depot LLC

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Carter filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Office Depot LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Keri Katz and Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Keri Katz

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carter, Susan

Defendants

Office Depot LLC

RVS Retail LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEHR, JESSICA E

Attorney at LEHR LAW APC

Defendant Attorney

Herzog, Jonathon J.

Attorney at WESTON HERZOG LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Carter, Susan. Refers to: Office Depot LLC; RVS Retail LP

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Carter, Susan. Refers to: Office Depot LLC; RVS Retail LP

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Carter, Susan. Refers to: Office Depot LLC; RVS Retail LP

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Carter, Susan. Refers to: Office Depot LLC; RVS Retail LP

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge filed by Carter, Susan.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Katz, Keri to Richard Whitney effective 07/13/2021

Defendants' First Amended Answer

Amended Answer (and proof of service) filed by Office Depot LLC; RVS Retail LP.

Answer

Answer filed by Office Depot LLC; RVS Retail LP.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal re RVS

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Carter, Susan. Refers to: RVS Retail LP

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal re OD

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Carter, Susan. Refers to: Office Depot LLC

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Answer (and proof of service) filed by Office Depot LLC; RVS Retail LP. Filed By: Office Depot LLC (Defendant); RVS Retail LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Office Depot LLC; RVS Retail LP. Filed By: Office Depot LLC (Defendant); RVS Retail LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Carter, Susan. Refers to: Office Depot LLC Filed By: Carter, Susan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Carter, Susan. Refers to: RVS Retail LP Filed By: Carter, Susan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Katz, Keri to Richard Whitney effective 07/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/04/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge filed by Carter, Susan. Filed By: Carter, Susan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/04/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Carter, Susan. Refers to: Office Depot LLC; RVS Retail LP Filed By: Carter, Susan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Carter, Susan. Refers to: Office Depot LLC; RVS Retail LP Filed By: Carter, Susan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Carter, Susan. Refers to: Office Depot LLC; RVS Retail LP Filed By: Carter, Susan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Carter, Susan. Refers to: Office Depot LLC; RVS Retail LP Filed By: Carter, Susan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Carter, Susan. Refers to: Office Depot LLC; RVS Retail LP Filed By: Carter, Susan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Katz, Keri.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RVS Retail LP is a litigant

Latest cases where OFFICE DEPOT/OFFICE MAX is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERZOG JONATHON