This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/14/2022 at 08:08:31 (UTC).

Carrillo vs Saicam Logistics Inc

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 Carrillo filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Saicam Logistics Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carrillo, Cristina

Defendants

Romerow, Alan Villarreal

Saicam Logistics Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Glassman, Robert S

11111 Santa Monica Boulevard 700

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

Maranesi, Nicholas

Attorney at WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

2212 Dupont Dr

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Carrillo, Cristina. Refers to: Saicam Logistics Inc; Romerow, Alan

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Carrillo, Cristina. Refers to: Saicam Logistics Inc; Romerow, Alan

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Carrillo, Cristina. Refers to: Saicam Logistics Inc; Romerow, Alan

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Carrillo, Cristina. Refers to: Saicam Logistics Inc

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Saicam Logistics Inc.

Demand for Jury Trial (Trial/Hearing Setting)

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Saicam Logistics Inc.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Saicam Logistics Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Saicam Logistics Inc.; Filed By: Saicam Logistics Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Saicam Logistics Inc.; Filed By: Saicam Logistics Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Saicam Logistics Inc.; Filed By: Saicam Logistics Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Carrillo, Cristina. Refers to: Saicam Logistics Inc; Filed By: Carrillo, Cristina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Carrillo, Cristina. Refers to: Saicam Logistics Inc; Romerow, Alan; Filed By: Carrillo, Cristina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Carrillo, Cristina. Refers to: Saicam Logistics Inc; Romerow, Alan; Filed By: Carrillo, Cristina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Carrillo, Cristina. Refers to: Saicam Logistics Inc; Romerow, Alan; Filed By: Carrillo, Cristina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less