This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 07:06:16 (UTC).

CARRILLO VS CORNING INCORPORATED

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 CARRILLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CORNING INCORPORATED. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ

VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA

Defendants

ACE AND COMPANY INC

CORNING INCORPORATED

STRAN TECHNOLOGIES IT SERVICES LLC

TOVAR, ISAAC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Salomon, Aaron

Attorney at PINES SALOMON INJURY LAWYERS APC

4660 La Jolla Village Dr Suite 575

San Diego, CA 92122

Defendant Attorney

Volk, Amy E

21680 Gateway Center Dr Ste 100

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ; VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA. Refers to: CORNING INCORPORATED; STRAN TECHNOLOGIES IT SERVICES LLC; ACE AND COMPANY INC; TOVAR, ISAAC

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ; VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA. Refers to: CORNING INCORPORATED; STRAN TECHNOLOGIES IT SERVICES LLC; ACE AND COMPANY INC; TOVAR, ISAAC

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ; VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA. Refers to: CORNING INCORPORATED; STRAN TECHNOLOGIES IT SERVICES LLC; ACE AND COMPANY INC; TOVAR, ISAAC

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ; VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ; VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ; VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ; VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA.

Answer

Answer (WITH POS) filed by CORNING INCORPORATED; TOVAR, ISAAC.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by CORNING INCORPORATED; TOVAR, ISAAC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by CORNING INCORPORATED; TOVAR, ISAAC.; Filed By: CORNING INCORPORATED (Defendant); TOVAR, ISAAC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (WITH POS) filed by CORNING INCORPORATED; TOVAR, ISAAC.; Filed By: CORNING INCORPORATED (Defendant); TOVAR, ISAAC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ; VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA.; Filed By: CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ (Plaintiff); VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ; VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA.; Filed By: CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ (Plaintiff); VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ; VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA.; Filed By: CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ (Plaintiff); VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ; VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA.; Filed By: CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ (Plaintiff); VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/06/2023 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ; VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA. Refers to: CORNING INCORPORATED; STRAN TECHNOLOGIES IT SERVICES LLC; ACE AND COMPANY INC; TOVAR, ISAAC; Filed By: CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ (Plaintiff); VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ; VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA. Refers to: CORNING INCORPORATED; STRAN TECHNOLOGIES IT SERVICES LLC; ACE AND COMPANY INC; TOVAR, ISAAC; Filed By: CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ (Plaintiff); VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ; VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA. Refers to: CORNING INCORPORATED; STRAN TECHNOLOGIES IT SERVICES LLC; ACE AND COMPANY INC; TOVAR, ISAAC; Filed By: CARRILLO, DAVID VALDEZ (Plaintiff); VALDEZ BRICENO, VANESSA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Corning Incorporated is a litigant