This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/25/2018 at 07:55:25 (UTC).

Carolyn Sue Winthrop vs. Sharp Healthcare

Case Summary

On 01/30/2009 Carolyn Sue Winthrop filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sharp Healthcare. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WINTHROP, CAROLYN SUE

Defendants

SHARP HEALTHCARE

SHARP GROSSMONT HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRISEBOIS, MARK T

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MARK T RISEBOIS

2488 Historic Decatur Road 200

San Diego, CA 92106

Defendant Attorney

DOGGETT, JEFFREY S

Attorney at LOTZ DOGGETT & RAWERS LLP

101 W Broadway 1110

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/09/2009 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 02/22/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 01/05/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/09/2009 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 02/22/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 01/05/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 03/24/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2012
  • Location changed TO IRON MOUNTAIN - BARCODE 683053339

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Winthrop, Carolyn Sue. Filed By: Winthrop, Carolyn Sue (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 03/24/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 03/24/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 02/22/2010 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 02/22/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 01/05/2010 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 01/05/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2009
  • Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - mediation did not take place (Parties not ready) filed by DOMINSKI, DEBRA A.. Filed By: DOMINSKI, DEBRA A (Mediator)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2009
  • Case Management Statement filed by Winthrop, Carolyn Sue. Filed By: Winthrop, Carolyn Sue (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2009
  • Case Management Statement filed by Sharp Healthcare. Filed By: Sharp Healthcare (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/09/2009 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • Certificate of Service filed by Winthrop, Carolyn Sue. Filed By: Winthrop, Carolyn Sue (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2009
  • Answer filed by Sharp Healthcare. Refers to: Winthrop, Carolyn Filed By: Sharp Healthcare (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • Original Summons filed by Winthrop, Carolyn Sue. Refers to: Sharp Healthcare; Sharp Grossmont Hospital Filed By: Winthrop, Carolyn Sue (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Winthrop, Carolyn Sue. Refers to: Sharp Healthcare; Sharp Grossmont Hospital Filed By: Winthrop, Carolyn Sue (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2009
  • Complaint filed by Winthrop, Carolyn Sue. Refers to: Sharp Healthcare; Sharp Grossmont Hospital Filed By: Winthrop, Carolyn Sue (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • Case details updated.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.