This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/27/2020 at 04:00:39 (UTC).

Carmen Reed vs. Fred Reed

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Carmen Reed filed an Other lawsuit against Fred Reed. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-SC

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Reed, Carmen

Respondent

Reed, Fred

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MacRae, Jenna

Attorney at ELDER LAW & ADVOCACY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • HearingLocation: S-09; Event Type: Hearing on Restraining Order - Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders (Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Prevention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Hearing on Restraining Order reassigned to for 03/05/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in S-07 at South County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 03/05/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at South County in S-07 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Petitioner's request to continue the Hearing on Restraining Order and reissue the temporary orders was granted. The Hearing on Restraining Order was continued to 03/30/2020 at 01:30 PM in Department S-09.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/05/2020 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Reed, Carmen. Refers to: Reed, Fred Filed By: Reed, Carmen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Declaration - Other filed by Reed, Carmen. Refers to: Reed, Fred Filed By: Reed, Carmen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by Reed, Carmen. Refers to: Reed, Fred Filed By: Reed, Carmen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Proof of Service filed by Reed, Carmen. Refers to: Reed, Fred Filed By: Reed, Carmen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders (Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Prevention) filed by Reed, Carmen. Refers to: Reed, Fred Filed By: Reed, Carmen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Reed, Carmen. Refers to: Reed, Fred Filed By: Reed, Carmen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Notice of Court Hearing filed by Reed, Carmen. Refers to: Reed, Fred Filed By: Reed, Carmen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Case assigned to Department S-09.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Temporary Restraining Order filed by Reed, Carmen. Refers to: Reed, Fred Filed By: Reed, Carmen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Request - Other (Spanish Interpreter) filed by Reed, Carmen. Refers to: Reed, Fred Filed By: Reed, Carmen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse scheduled for 03/05/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at South County in S-09 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Order for Removal from Residence filed by Reed, Carmen. Refers to: Reed, Fred Filed By: Reed, Carmen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.