This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/17/2018 at 03:24:29 (UTC).

Carlos Vargas vs. Lorene Boyters

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 Carlos Vargas filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Lorene Boyters. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W POLLACK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

GREGORY W POLLACK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VARGAS, CARLOS

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ASAP JUNK HAULING

BOYTERS, LORENE

FIGUEROA, JONATHAN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

BOYTERS, LORENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAZARUS, MARC

Attorney at RUSSELL & LAZARUS APC

1401 Dove 310

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ZYMAN, STELLA H.

Attorney at AUSTIN BROWNWOOD CANNON & SANTA CRUZ

1615 Murray Canyon Road 550

San Diego, CA 92108-4314

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Vargas, Carlos. Refers to: Boyters, Lorene

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Vargas, Carlos. Refers to: Figueroa, Jonathan

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Vargas, Carlos. Refers to: ASAP JUNK HAULING

General Denial

General Denial filed by Boyters, Lorene.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Boyters, Lorene.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Boyters, Lorene. Refers to: ASAP JUNK HAULING; Figueroa, Jonathan

Original Summons

Original Summons (on Cross Complaint) filed by Boyters, Lorene. Refers to: ASAP JUNK HAULING; Figueroa, Jonathan

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Vargas, Carlos.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Boyters, Lorene.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (Not Entered) filed by Vargas, Carlos. Refers to: Figueroa, Jonathan

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (Not Entered) filed by Vargas, Carlos. Refers to: ASAP JUNK HAULING

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Vargas, Carlos.

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Figueroa, Jonathan

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default filed by was denied. Refers to: ASAP JUNK HAULING

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 24]

Request for Entry of Default

[Another document for ROA# 24]

Case Management Statement

[Another document for ROA# 24]

Request for Entry of Default

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 05/04/2018 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 03/23/2018 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketDefault Prove-Up Hearing scheduled for 04/27/2018 at 03:00:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Default Prove-Up Hearing was rescheduled to 04/27/2018 at 03:00:00 PM in C-71 before Gregory W Pollack at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Boyters, Lorene .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Vargas, Carlos. Refers to: Boyters, Lorene; Boyters, Lorene Filed By: Vargas, Carlos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Figueroa, Jonathan .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to ASAP JUNK HAULING.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Boyters, Lorene .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: Boyters, Lorene; Boyters, Lorene; Figueroa, Jonathan; ASAP JUNK HAULING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Vargas, Carlos. Refers to: Boyters, Lorene Filed By: Vargas, Carlos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Vargas, Carlos. Filed By: Vargas, Carlos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First) filed by Vargas, Carlos. Refers to: Boyters, Lorene; Figueroa, Jonathan; ASAP JUNK HAULING Filed By: Vargas, Carlos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/17/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Vargas, Carlos. Refers to: Boyters, Lorene; ASAP JUNK HAULING; Figueroa, Jonathan Filed By: Vargas, Carlos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vargas, Carlos. Refers to: Boyters, Lorene; ASAP JUNK HAULING; Figueroa, Jonathan Filed By: Vargas, Carlos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Vargas, Carlos. Refers to: Boyters, Lorene; ASAP JUNK HAULING; Figueroa, Jonathan Filed By: Vargas, Carlos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAZARUS MARC