This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/08/2018 at 03:47:09 (UTC).

CARLA MALLORY VS. AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC

Case Summary

On 07/22/2014 CARLA MALLORY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUDITH F. HAYES. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JUDITH F. HAYES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Allen, Mattie S

Arnell, Tami Beert

Bentley Sr, William

Bridges, Shelley

Bruggeman, Kay

Byrd, Ricky

Bentley, William

Alma Cohen as Child of Alpin Lleshanaku

GONZALO RAMOS JR AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF ESTATE OF MARIA E RAMOS DECEASED

MARY B CLARK AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF ESTATE OF EDWARD CLARK SR DECEASED

HAMMOND, DANIEL

CARSON, LC

SHACKELFORD, PATRICIA A

WAITES, ELLIOTT

NAGHMANA JANJUA AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF ESTATE OF MOHAMMAD JANJUA DECEASED

GERALDINE M ROMANO AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF ESTATE OF JOHN A ROMANO DECEASED

Defendants

AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC

Bruggeman, Aaron Michael

Bruggeman, Christopher Lee

Bruggeman, James Frances

71 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Depew, Brian D; JOHNSON, MICHAEL K

Attorney at ENGSTROM LIPSCOMB & LACK

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Depew, Brian D

Attorney at ENGSTROM LIPSCOMB & LACK

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

JOHNSON, MICHAEL K

Attorney at JOHNSON BECKER PLLC

33 South 6Th St

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Other Attorneys

YOUNG, CHRISTOPHER M

Attorney at DLA PIPER LLP

401 B Street 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

STANLEY, DAVID E

355 S Grand Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90071

WILLIAMS, RAYMOND M

Attorney at DLA PIPER LLP ONE LIBERTY PLACE

1650 Market Street 4900

Philadelphia, PA 19103

HERNANDEZ, DON

2 N Lake Ave

Pasadena, CA 91101

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (Third) filed by Hammond, Susan; Hammond, Daniel; Mallory, Carla; Saldana, Rosario; Varsi, Sandra; Zarger, Mordechia; Bruggeman, Kay; Vollmer, George; Clark, Mary B; Willis, Mary F;OTHERS. Refers to: Bruggeman, James; Bruggeman, Aaron; Bruggeman, Christopher; Byrd, Vickie; Clark, Edward; Clark, Edward; AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; Eli Lilly and Company; McKesson Corporation; Merck & Co Inc; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp; Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd; Merck Sharp & Dohme Italia SPA; Novo Nordisk Inc; Novo Nordisk A/S; LLESHANAKU, ASTRIT

Original Summons

Original Summons (on First Amended Complaint) filed by Hammond, Susan; Hammond, Daniel; Mallory, Carla; Saldana, Rosario; Varsi, Sandra; Zarger, Mordechia; Bruggeman, Kay; Vollmer, George; Clark, Mary B; Willis, Mary F;OTHERS. Refers to: Bruggeman, James; Bruggeman, Aaron; Bruggeman, Christopher; AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; Eli Lilly and Company; McKesson Corporation; Merck & Co Inc; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp; Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd; Merck Sharp & Dohme Italia SPA; Novo Nordisk Inc; Novo Nordisk A/S; Byrd, Vickie; Clark, Edward

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (McKesson Corporation) filed by Carla Mallory as successor in interest of Estate of Stephen Mallory Deceased. Refers to: McKesson Corporation

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (First) filed by Hammond, Susan; Hammond, Daniel; Mallory, Carla; Saldana, Rosario; Varsi, Sandra; Zarger, Mordechia; Bruggeman, Kay; Vollmer, George; Clark, Mary B; Willis, Mary F;OTHERS. Refers to: Bruggeman, James; Bruggeman, Aaron; Bruggeman, Christopher; AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; Eli Lilly and Company; McKesson Corporation; Merck & Co Inc; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp; Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd; Merck Sharp & Dohme Italia SPA; Novo Nordisk Inc; Novo Nordisk A/S; Byrd, Vickie; Clark, Edward

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Hammond, Susan; Hammond, Daniel; Mallory, Carla; Saldana, Rosario; Varsi, Sandra; Zarger, Mordechia; Bruggeman, Kay; Vollmer, George; Clark, Mary B; Willis, Mary F;OTHERS. Refers to: Byrd, Vickie; Clark, Edward; AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; Eli Lilly and Company; McKesson Corporation; Merck & Co Inc; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp; Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd; Merck Sharp & Dohme Italia SPA; Novo Nordisk Inc; Novo Nordisk A/S; Bruggeman, James; Bruggeman, Aaron; Bruggeman, Christopher; Clark, Edward

Complaint

Complaint filed by Mallory, Carla; Saldana, Rosario; Varsi, Sandra; Zarger, Mordechia; Bruggeman, Kay; Vollmer, George; Clark, Mary B; Willis, Mary F; Allen, Mattie S; Byrd, Terry;OTHERS. Refers to: AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; Eli Lilly and Company; McKesson Corporation; Merck & Co Inc; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp; Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd; Merck Sharp & Dohme Italia SPA; Novo Nordisk Inc; Novo Nordisk A/S; Bruggeman, James; Bruggeman, Aaron; Bruggeman, Christopher

as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp) filed by Hammond, Susan; Hammond, Daniel; Mallory, Carla; Saldana, Rosario; Varsi, Sandra; Zarger, Mordechia; Bruggeman, Kay; Vollmer, George; Clark, Mary B; Willis, Mary F;OTHERS. Refers to: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp

Receipt for Record

Receipt for Record (Return Receipt for Certified Mail - Transferred case) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Mallory, Carla; Saldana, Rosario; Varsi, Sandra; Zarger, Mordechia; Bruggeman, Kay; Vollmer, George; Clark, Mary B; Willis, Mary F; Allen, Mattie S; Byrd, Terry;OTHERS. Refers to: AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; Eli Lilly and Company; McKesson Corporation; Merck & Co Inc; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp; Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd; Merck Sharp & Dohme Italia SPA; Novo Nordisk Inc; Novo Nordisk A/S; Bruggeman, James; Bruggeman, Aaron; Bruggeman, Christopher

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (Second) filed by Hammond, Susan; Hammond, Daniel; Mallory, Carla; Saldana, Rosario; Varsi, Sandra; Zarger, Mordechia; Bruggeman, Kay; Vollmer, George; Clark, Mary B; Willis, Mary F;OTHERS. Refers to: Bruggeman, James; Bruggeman, Aaron; Bruggeman, Christopher; Byrd, Vickie; Clark, Edward; Clark, Edward; AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; Eli Lilly and Company; McKesson Corporation; Merck & Co Inc; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp; Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd; Merck Sharp & Dohme Italia SPA; Novo Nordisk Inc; Novo Nordisk A/S

as to Novo Nordisk Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to Novo Nordisk Inc) filed by Hammond, Susan; Hammond, Daniel; Mallory, Carla; Saldana, Rosario; Varsi, Sandra; Zarger, Mordechia; Bruggeman, Kay; Vollmer, George; Clark, Mary B; Willis, Mary F;OTHERS. Refers to: Novo Nordisk Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

as to Eli Lilly and Company

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to Eli Lilly and Company) filed by Hammond, Susan; Hammond, Daniel; Mallory, Carla; Saldana, Rosario; Varsi, Sandra; Zarger, Mordechia; Bruggeman, Kay; Vollmer, George; Clark, Mary B; Willis, Mary F;OTHERS. Refers to: Eli Lilly and Company

as to Merck & Co Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to Merck & Co Inc) filed by Hammond, Susan; Hammond, Daniel; Mallory, Carla; Saldana, Rosario; Varsi, Sandra; Zarger, Mordechia; Bruggeman, Kay; Vollmer, George; Clark, Mary B; Willis, Mary F;OTHERS. Refers to: Merck & Co Inc

Answer

Answer filed by Novo Nordisk Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Novo Nordisk Inc.

Notice - Other

Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination (JCCP4574 Add-On Case) filed by Eli Lilly and Company.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mallory, Carla; Saldana, Rosario; Varsi, Sandra; Zarger, Mordechia; Bruggeman, Kay; Vollmer, George; Clark, Mary B; Willis, Mary F; Allen, Mattie S; Byrd, Terry;OTHERS. Refers to: AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; Eli Lilly and Company; McKesson Corporation; Merck & Co Inc; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp; Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd; Merck Sharp & Dohme Italia SPA; Novo Nordisk Inc; Novo Nordisk A/S; Bruggeman, James; Bruggeman, Aaron; Bruggeman, Christopher

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt for Record (Return Receipt for Certified Mail - Transferred case) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case file contents transferred to receiving court LOS ANGELES pursuant to court order. ordered to JCCP4574

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/10/2015 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Judith F. Hayes was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (Third) filed by Hammond, Susan; Hammond, Daniel; Mallory, Carla; Saldana, Rosario; Varsi, Sandra; Zarger, Mordechia; Bruggeman, Kay; Vollmer, George; Clark, Mary B; Willis, Mary F;OTHERS. Refers to: Bruggeman, James; Bruggeman, Aaron; Bruggeman, Christopher; Byrd, Vickie; Clark, Edward; Clark, Edward; AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; Eli Lilly and Company; McKesson Corporation; Merck & Co Inc; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp; Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd; Merck Sharp & Dohme Italia SPA; Novo Nordisk Inc; Novo Nordisk A/S; LLESHANAKU, ASTRIT Filed By: Hammond, Susan (Plaintiff); Hammond, Daniel (Plaintiff); Mallory, Carla (Plaintiff); Saldana, Rosario (Plaintiff); Varsi, Sandra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Hammond, Susan; Hammond, Daniel; Mallory, Carla; Saldana, Rosario; Varsi, Sandra; Zarger, Mordechia; Bruggeman, Kay; Vollmer, George; Clark, Mary B; Willis, Mary F;OTHERS. Refers to: Byrd, Vickie; Clark, Edward; AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; Eli Lilly and Company; McKesson Corporation; Merck & Co Inc; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp; Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd; Merck Sharp & Dohme Italia SPA; Novo Nordisk Inc; Novo Nordisk A/S; Bruggeman, James; Bruggeman, Aaron; Bruggeman, Christopher; Clark, Edward Filed By: Hammond, Susan (Plaintiff); Hammond, Daniel (Plaintiff); Mallory, Carla (Plaintiff); Saldana, Rosario (Plaintiff); Varsi, Sandra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (of Entry of Order) filed by Eli Lilly and Company. Filed By: Eli Lilly and Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Merck & Co Inc; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. Filed By: Merck & Co Inc (Defendant); Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination (JCCP4574 Add-On Case) filed by Eli Lilly and Company. Filed By: Eli Lilly and Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Novo Nordisk Inc. Filed By: Novo Nordisk Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Novo Nordisk Inc. Filed By: Novo Nordisk Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons (on First Amended Complaint) filed by Hammond, Susan; Hammond, Daniel; Mallory, Carla; Saldana, Rosario; Varsi, Sandra; Zarger, Mordechia; Bruggeman, Kay; Vollmer, George; Clark, Mary B; Willis, Mary F;OTHERS. Refers to: Bruggeman, James; Bruggeman, Aaron; Bruggeman, Christopher; AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; Eli Lilly and Company; McKesson Corporation; Merck & Co Inc; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp; Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd; Merck Sharp & Dohme Italia SPA; Novo Nordisk Inc; Novo Nordisk A/S; Byrd, Vickie; Clark, Edward Filed By: Hammond, Susan (Plaintiff); Hammond, Daniel (Plaintiff); Mallory, Carla (Plaintiff); Saldana, Rosario (Plaintiff); Varsi, Sandra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (First) filed by Hammond, Susan; Hammond, Daniel; Mallory, Carla; Saldana, Rosario; Varsi, Sandra; Zarger, Mordechia; Bruggeman, Kay; Vollmer, George; Clark, Mary B; Willis, Mary F;OTHERS. Refers to: Bruggeman, James; Bruggeman, Aaron; Bruggeman, Christopher; AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; Eli Lilly and Company; McKesson Corporation; Merck & Co Inc; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp; Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd; Merck Sharp & Dohme Italia SPA; Novo Nordisk Inc; Novo Nordisk A/S; Byrd, Vickie; Clark, Edward Filed By: Hammond, Susan (Plaintiff); Hammond, Daniel (Plaintiff); Mallory, Carla (Plaintiff); Saldana, Rosario (Plaintiff); Varsi, Sandra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/10/2015 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Judith F. Hayes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Hayes, Judith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Related Case filed by Mallory, Carla; Saldana, Rosario; Varsi, Sandra; Zarger, Mordechia; Bruggeman, Kay; Vollmer, George; Clark, Mary B; Willis, Mary F; Allen, Mattie S; Byrd, Terry;OTHERS. Refers to: AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; Eli Lilly and Company; McKesson Corporation; Merck & Co Inc; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp; Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd; Merck Sharp & Dohme Italia SPA; Novo Nordisk Inc; Novo Nordisk A/S; Bruggeman, James; Bruggeman, Aaron; Bruggeman, Christopher Filed By: Mallory, Carla (Plaintiff); Saldana, Rosario (Plaintiff); Varsi, Sandra (Plaintiff); Zarger, Mordechia (Plaintiff); Bruggeman, Kay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Mallory, Carla; Saldana, Rosario; Varsi, Sandra; Zarger, Mordechia; Bruggeman, Kay; Vollmer, George; Clark, Mary B; Willis, Mary F; Allen, Mattie S; Byrd, Terry;OTHERS. Refers to: AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; Eli Lilly and Company; McKesson Corporation; Merck & Co Inc; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp; Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd; Merck Sharp & Dohme Italia SPA; Novo Nordisk Inc; Novo Nordisk A/S; Bruggeman, James; Bruggeman, Aaron; Bruggeman, Christopher Filed By: Mallory, Carla (Plaintiff); Saldana, Rosario (Plaintiff); Varsi, Sandra (Plaintiff); Zarger, Mordechia (Plaintiff); Bruggeman, Kay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mallory, Carla; Saldana, Rosario; Varsi, Sandra; Zarger, Mordechia; Bruggeman, Kay; Vollmer, George; Clark, Mary B; Willis, Mary F; Allen, Mattie S; Byrd, Terry;OTHERS. Refers to: AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; Eli Lilly and Company; McKesson Corporation; Merck & Co Inc; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp; Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd; Merck Sharp & Dohme Italia SPA; Novo Nordisk Inc; Novo Nordisk A/S; Bruggeman, James; Bruggeman, Aaron; Bruggeman, Christopher Filed By: Mallory, Carla (Plaintiff); Saldana, Rosario (Plaintiff); Varsi, Sandra (Plaintiff); Zarger, Mordechia (Plaintiff); Bruggeman, Kay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Mallory, Carla; Saldana, Rosario; Varsi, Sandra; Zarger, Mordechia; Bruggeman, Kay; Vollmer, George; Clark, Mary B; Willis, Mary F; Allen, Mattie S; Byrd, Terry;OTHERS. Refers to: AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; Eli Lilly and Company; McKesson Corporation; Merck & Co Inc; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp; Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd; Merck Sharp & Dohme Italia SPA; Novo Nordisk Inc; Novo Nordisk A/S; Bruggeman, James; Bruggeman, Aaron; Bruggeman, Christopher Filed By: Mallory, Carla (Plaintiff); Saldana, Rosario (Plaintiff); Varsi, Sandra (Plaintiff); Zarger, Mordechia (Plaintiff); Bruggeman, Kay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less