This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/01/2019 at 00:17:07 (UTC).

Capital One, N.A. vs. Marina Carmelo

Case Summary

On 05/04/2010 Capital One, N A filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Marina Carmelo. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************D-SC

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE NA

Defendants

DIAZ-CARMONA, DAMIAN

SANCHEZ, ANA ISABEL

SANCHEZ-CARMONA, HUGO JESUS

CARMONA-BORROSO, YOLANDA

SANCHEZ, JOSE DE JESUS

CARMELO, MARINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMESON, GAYLE E

Attorney at MCCARTHY & HOLTHUS LLP

1770 Fourth Ave

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing Pre-Judgment Claim of Right of Possession SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Filing Pre-Judgment Claim of Right of Possession SD

Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession filed by SANCHEZ, ANA ISABEL.

Notice of Filing Pre-Judgment Claim of Right of Possession SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Filing Pre-Judgment Claim of Right of Possession SD

Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession filed by CARMONA-BORROSO, YOLANDA; DIAZ-CARMONA, DAMIAN; SANCHEZ-CARMONA, HUGO JESUS.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 08/03/2010 09:00:00 AM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by SANCHEZ-CARMONA, HUGO JESUS, on 05/18/2010, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by DIAZ-CARMONA, DAMIAN, on 05/18/2010, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by CARMONA-BORROSO, YOLANDA, on 05/18/2010, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • Stipulation for Entry of Judgment filed by Capital One NA. Refers to: SANCHEZ, ANA; CARMONA-BORROSO, YOLANDA; DIAZ-CARMONA, DAMIAN; SANCHEZ-CARMONA, HUGO Filed By: Capital One NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • Writ of Possession issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Capital One NA. Refers to: Carmelo, Marina; Sanchez, Jose Filed By: Capital One NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 08/03/2010 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • Judgment entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 08/03/2010 at 09:00:00 AM at South County in S-02 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • The default filed by Capital One, N.A. was entered as to Carmelo, Marina; Sanchez, Jose De Jesus on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 . Override feature used.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession filed by CARMONA-BORROSO, YOLANDA; DIAZ-CARMONA, DAMIAN; SANCHEZ-CARMONA, HUGO JESUS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 8]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by CARMONA-BORROSO, YOLANDA; DIAZ-CARMONA, DAMIAN; SANCHEZ-CARMONA, HUGO JESUS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession filed by SANCHEZ, ANA ISABEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • Case assigned to Department S-02.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • Original Summons filed by Capital One, N.A.. Refers to: Carmelo, Marina; Sanchez, Jose Filed By: Capital One NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One, N.A.. Refers to: Carmelo, Marina; Sanchez, Jose Filed By: Capital One NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Capital One, N.A.. Refers to: Carmelo, Marina; Sanchez, Jose; SANCHEZ, ANA; CARMONA-BORROSO, YOLANDA; SANCHEZ-CARMONA, HUGO; SANCHEZ, ANA; DIAZ-CARMONA, DAMIAN Filed By: Capital One NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.