This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 22:41:34 (UTC).

Capital One Bank USA NA vs. Nery M Echeverria

Case Summary

On 12/10/2010 Capital One Bank USA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Nery M Echeverria. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH J MEDEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH J MEDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

ECHEVERRIA, NERY M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALSH, MARK D

Attorney at LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES INC

5030 Camino De La Siesta 340

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/02/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 05/13/2011 08:35:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/02/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Order to Show Cause (Non-Sanctions) SD

OSC - Non-Sanction scheduled for 07/20/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 06/17/2011 08:35:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Non-Sanction heard 07/20/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 08/12/2011 08:35:00 AM.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Cannon,William to Medel,Kenneth effective 02/25/2012

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/25/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/25/2012 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Court Trial was rescheduled to 10/23/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in S-07 before Kenneth J Medel at South County.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 10/23/2012 09:00:00 AM.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Echeverria, Nery M, on 01/11/2011, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 10/23/2012 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • Notice - Other (Notice Requesting and Requiring Parties to Attend Trial; Other Supporting Documents) filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Filed By: Capital One Bank USA NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • Civil Court Trial scheduled for 10/23/2012 at 09:00:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • The Civil Court Trial was rescheduled to 10/23/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in S-07 before Kenneth J Medel at South County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/25/2012 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • Civil Court Trial scheduled for 10/09/2012 at 09:00AM before Judge Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/25/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2011
  • Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/02/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • Motion - Other (Motion to Amend the Complaint; Other Supporting Documents) filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Echeverria, Nery Filed By: Capital One Bank USA NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2011
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 05/13/2011 at 08:35:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Echeverria, Nery M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Echeverria, Nery Filed By: Capital One Bank USA NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2010
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Echeverria, Nery Filed By: Capital One Bank USA NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2010
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Echeverria, Nery Filed By: Capital One Bank USA NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.