Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/02/2021 at 08:36:09 (UTC).

Cannon Constructors South Inc vs Hood Pacific Contractors Inc

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 Cannon Constructors South Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hood Pacific Contractors Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cannon Constructors South Inc

Defendants

Western National Mutual Insurance Company

Hood Pacific Contractors Inc

State National Insurance Company Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lantz, Nowell A

Defendant Attorney

IDLER, DARYL CUNNINGHAM Jr

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party SD

Answer submitted by Hood Pacific Contractors Inc; Western National Mutual Insurance Company; State National Insurance Company Inc rejected on 04/14/2021.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Answer submitted by Hood Pacific Contractors Inc; Western National Mutual Insurance Company; State National Insurance Company Inc rejected on 04/20/2021.

Answer

Answer filed by Hood Pacific Contractors Inc; State National Insurance Company Inc; Western National Mutual Insurance Company.

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Western National Mutual Insurance Company

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Cannon Constructors South Inc.

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - State National Insurance Company

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Cannon Constructors South Inc.

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Hood Pacific Contractors, Inc.

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Cannon Constructors South Inc.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Cannon Constructors South Inc. Refers to: Hood Pacific Contractors Inc; Western National Mutual Insurance Company; State National Insurance Company Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cannon Constructors South Inc. Refers to: Hood Pacific Contractors Inc; Western National Mutual Insurance Company; State National Insurance Company Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Cannon Constructors South Inc. Refers to: Hood Pacific Contractors Inc; Western National Mutual Insurance Company; State National Insurance Company Inc

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Cannon Constructors South Inc. Refers to: Hood Pacific Contractors Inc; Western National Mutual Insurance Company; State National Insurance Company Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Hood Pacific Contractors Inc; State National Insurance Company Inc; Western National Mutual Insurance Company. Filed By: Hood Pacific Contractors Inc (Defendant); State National Insurance Company Inc (Defendant); Western National Mutual Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer submitted by Hood Pacific Contractors Inc; Western National Mutual Insurance Company; State National Insurance Company Inc rejected on 04/20/2021. Filed By: Hood Pacific Contractors Inc (Defendant); Western National Mutual Insurance Company (Defendant); State National Insurance Company Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer submitted by Hood Pacific Contractors Inc; Western National Mutual Insurance Company; State National Insurance Company Inc rejected on 04/14/2021. Filed By: Hood Pacific Contractors Inc (Defendant); Western National Mutual Insurance Company (Defendant); State National Insurance Company Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Cannon Constructors South Inc. Filed By: Cannon Constructors South Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Cannon Constructors South Inc. Filed By: Cannon Constructors South Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Cannon Constructors South Inc. Filed By: Cannon Constructors South Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Cannon Constructors South Inc. Refers to: Hood Pacific Contractors Inc; Western National Mutual Insurance Company; State National Insurance Company Inc Filed By: Cannon Constructors South Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cannon Constructors South Inc. Refers to: Hood Pacific Contractors Inc; Western National Mutual Insurance Company; State National Insurance Company Inc Filed By: Cannon Constructors South Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Cannon Constructors South Inc. Refers to: Hood Pacific Contractors Inc; Western National Mutual Insurance Company; State National Insurance Company Inc Filed By: Cannon Constructors South Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by Cannon Constructors South Inc. Refers to: Hood Pacific Contractors Inc; Western National Mutual Insurance Company; State National Insurance Company Inc Filed By: Cannon Constructors South Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hood Pacific Contractors Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Cannon Constructors South Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTERN NATIONAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, BOND NO. 29297 is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY INC. is a litigant