This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 08:01:22 (UTC).

Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc vs Caicedo

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Caicedo. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cynthia A. Freeland. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cynthia A. Freeland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc

Defendants

Caicedo, Christopher

Kirwan, Bailey L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Veldkamp, Arnold L

1564 W Mission Rd

Escondido, CA 92029

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does (DOES 1-100) filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc. Refers to: Caicedo, Christopher; Kirwan, Bailey

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 13]

Request for Entry of Default

[Another document for ROA# 13]

Request for Dismissal of Does

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Request for Entry of Default

Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc. Refers to: Caicedo, Christopher; Kirwan, Bailey

Judgment by Default by Clerk

Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc. Refers to: Caicedo, Christopher; Kirwan, Bailey

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc.

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc. Refers to: Caicedo, Christopher

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc. Refers to: Kirwan, Bailey

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc. Refers to: Caicedo, Christopher; Kirwan, Bailey

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc. Refers to: Caicedo, Christopher; Kirwan, Bailey

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc. Refers to: Caicedo, Christopher; Kirwan, Bailey

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc. Filed By: Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc and against Caicedo, Christopher ;Kirwan, Bailey L for $ 6619.10, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 890.52, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 7509.62.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/05/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc. Refers to: Caicedo, Christopher; Kirwan, Bailey Filed By: Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc. Filed By: Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc. Refers to: Caicedo, Christopher; Kirwan, Bailey Filed By: Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc. Refers to: Caicedo, Christopher; Kirwan, Bailey Filed By: Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc. Filed By: Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 13]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc. Refers to: Caicedo, Christopher; Kirwan, Bailey Filed By: Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc. Refers to: Caicedo, Christopher Filed By: Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc. Refers to: Kirwan, Bailey Filed By: Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc. Refers to: Caicedo, Christopher; Kirwan, Bailey Filed By: Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc. Refers to: Caicedo, Christopher; Kirwan, Bailey Filed By: Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc. Refers to: Caicedo, Christopher; Kirwan, Bailey Filed By: Calvin Christian School of Escondido Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Freeland, Cynthia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/05/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Veldkamp, Arnold L