This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 11:31:17 (UTC).

California Truckers Safety Association vs SD Remodeling Inc

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 California Truckers Safety Association filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SD Remodeling Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

California Truckers Safety Association

Heck, Christopher

Defendant

SD Remodeling Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Soleimanpour, Matthew

5771 La Jolla Blvd Suite 4

La Jolla, CA 92037

Drelich, Matan

Attorney at THE DRELICH LAW FIRM PC

101 West Broadway 1280

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Kenny, Eugene P

Attorney at GRIMM VRANJES GREER STEPHAN & BRIDGMAN LLP

750 B Street 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 11/19/2021 at 02:30:00 PM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

Application for Order to Serve the Secretary of State

Application for Order to Serve the Secretary of State filed by California Truckers Safety Association.

Declaration In Support of Application for Order to Serve the Secretary of State

Declaration - Other (of Matthew Soleimanpour) filed by California Truckers Safety Association.

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders (Order signed 6/7/2021) filed by California Truckers Safety Association.

Proposed Order

Order Allowing Service on the Secretary of State (Order signed 6/7/2021) filed by California Truckers Safety Association.

Proof of Service on Secretary of State (Mailing)

Proof of Service on Secretary of State (Mailing) filed by California Truckers Safety Association. Refers to: SD Remodeling Inc

Proof of Service on Secretary of State (Personal)

Proof of Service on Secretary of State (Personal) filed by California Truckers Safety Association. Refers to: SD Remodeling Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Heck, Christopher. Refers to: SD Remodeling Inc

Motion to Consolidate Cases

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Consolidate and Order Signed 7/22/21) filed by Heck, Christopher; California Truckers Safety Association.

Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Answer filed by SD Remodeling Inc.

Case Management Statement by Defendant SD Remodeling Inc

Case Management Statement filed by SD Remodeling Inc.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit by defendant SD Remodeling Inc

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by SD Remodeling Inc.

Amended Answer by Defendant SD Remodeling Inc

Amended Answer filed by SD Remodeling Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Heck, Christopher.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Heck, Christopher.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by California Truckers Safety Association.

Answer to Plaintiff Christopher Heck's Complaint

Answer filed by SD Remodeling Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/19/2021 02:30:00 PM.

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by SD Remodeling Inc. Filed By: SD Remodeling Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 08:30AM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/16/2022 at 10:45AM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketJury demanded by Plaintiff.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/19/2021 02:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by California Truckers Safety Association. Filed By: California Truckers Safety Association (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Heck, Christopher. Filed By: Heck, Christopher (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by California Truckers Safety Association. Refers to: SD Remodeling Inc Filed By: California Truckers Safety Association (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/20/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by California Truckers Safety Association. Refers to: SD Remodeling Inc Filed By: California Truckers Safety Association (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by California Truckers Safety Association. Refers to: SD Remodeling Inc Filed By: California Truckers Safety Association (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less